This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:15:06 (UTC).

Thomas F. Corbett Associates LLC v. Green Field Construction Group et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Thomas F Corbett Associates LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Green Field Construction Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02452

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas F. Corbett Associates LLC

Defendants

Green Field Construction Group

1170 Apartment Corp c/o Hakes

Green Field Builders Group

Green Field Construction Group, LLC

Brook Street Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher A. Smith

Attorney at Trivella, Forte & Smith, LLP

1311 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 170

White Plains, NY 10605

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Summons

4 #2

Summons

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated as per plaintiff's Rule 41(a) notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/6/2021. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas F. Corbett Associates LLC (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 5/10/2021 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See United States Liab. Ins. Co. v. M Remodeling Corp., 444 F. Supp. 3d 408, 40910 (E.D.N.Y. 2020). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/3/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to 1170 Apartment Corp c/o Hakes, Brook Street Associates, LLC, Green Field Construction Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Thomas F. Corbett Associates LLC, 1170 Apartment Corp c/o Hakes, Brook Street Associates, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14431043 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Thomas F. Corbett Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Smith