This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

Thomas et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Thomas filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thor Motor Coach, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra D. Thomas

Rodney L. Thomas

Defendants

THOR MOTOR COACH, INC

Ford Motor Company

Thor Motor Coach, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sara Mae Douglass

Attorney at Lemon Law Group Partners PLC - Gr/IN

48 N Emerson Ave Ste 400

Greenwood, IN 46143

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremiah J Wood

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP - Col/OH

200 Civic Ctr Dr Ste 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Erin V Bolden

Attorney at Thor Industries Inc

601 E Beardsley Ave

Elkhart, IN 46514

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/19/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2022 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/29/22. (slm) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Wood, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Wood, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

4 #1

Affidavit FORD affidavit of Service

4 #4

Main Document

1 #8

Proposed Summons FORD SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION

1 #7

Proposed Summons THOR SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #5

Exhibit E Return Receipt

1 #4

Exhibit D Written Notification

1 #3

Exhibit C Repair Orders

1 #2

Exhibit B THOR Warranty

1 #1

Exhibit A Purchase Agreement

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/19/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2022 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/29/22. (slm) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Bolden, Erin) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Wood, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Wood, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Thor Motor Coach, Inc. and Ford Motor Company Answer due 7/22/2022 pursuant to DE #4 . (kmt) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service Defendants served 7.1.22 by Rodney L. Thomas, Sandra D. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit FORD affidavit of Service)(Douglass, Sara) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company, Thor Motor Coach, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Mae Douglass on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Douglass, Sara) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4957854.), filed by Sandra D. Thomas, Rodney L. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B THOR Warranty, #3 Exhibit C Repair Orders, #4 Exhibit D Written Notification, #5 Exhibit E Return Receipt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #7 Proposed Summons THOR SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, #8 Proposed Summons FORD SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION)(Douglass, Sara) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Thor Motor Coach, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant