This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 05:47:02 (UTC).

Thomas et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Thomas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04117

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trisha Thomas

Ameerah Johnson-Merrida

Nila Maeder

Mara Diaz

Maria Eberhart

Virjinia Viera

Lisa Forrest

Sylvia Madison

Defendants

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Abbott Laboratories

Sutter Bay Hospitals doing business as Alta Bates Summit Medical Center Alta Bates Campus and Alta Bates Summit Medical Center Summit Campus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Elizabeth Graham

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer

201 Mission St., Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Mary Elizabeth Graham

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer

One Market Street, Spear Tower, 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Alexandra M Walsh

Attorney at Wilkinson Walsh LLP

2001 M Street Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Kimberly Jane Channick

Attorney at Walsh Law PLLC

13428 Maxella Avenue, #203

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Warren D. Postman

Attorney at Keller Postman LLC

1100 Vermont Avenue, N.W., 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony John Anscombe

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza

Jonathan Matthew Baum

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

1 Market St. #3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Celeste Marie Brecht

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Caroline Drew Murray

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ramanda R Luper

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael J Garvin

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 1400

Cleveland, OH 44114-2301

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

37 #1

*Restricted*

37 #37

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#36

(#36) MDL TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that these actions are transferred to the Northern District of Illinois and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by the MDL Panel on 8/5/2022. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#35

(#35) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING (14 in case 4:22-cv-02460-HSG; 16 in case 4:22-cv-02480-HSG; and 6 in case 4:22-cv-02598-HSG ) MOTIONS TO STAY. This order also terminates as moot docket nos. 28 in case 4:22-cv-02460-HSG and 19 in case 4:22-cv-02598-HSG. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

34 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

34 #34

Main Document

33 #33

Main Document

#24

(#34) REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySutter Bay Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Garvin, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

1 #12

Addendum Regarding Related Cases

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration of Celeste M. Brecht

1 #1

Main Document

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02460 (nsf,) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docketcase electronically transmitted to the Northern District of Illinois. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MDL TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that these actions are transferred to the Northern District of Illinois and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by the MDL Panel on 8/5/2022. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket***Deadlines Terminated.*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING (14 in case 4:22-cv-02460-HSG; 16 in case 4:22-cv-02480-HSG; and 6 in case 4:22-cv-02598-HSG ) MOTIONS TO STAY. This order also terminates as moot docket nos. 28 in case 4:22-cv-02460-HSG and 19 in case 4:22-cv-02598-HSG. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySutter Bay Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Garvin, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIESS NOTICE OF LODGING OF OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO VACATE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TO MDL NO. 3026 filed by Abbott Laboratories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RELATED CASE ORDER RE DOCKET NOS. #25 AND #26 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/13/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Advance the Hearing Date on Abbott's Motion to Stay Pending JPML's Final Order on Transfer to June 30, 2022 ) filed byTrisha Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Graham, Mary) (Filed on 6/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Trisha Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Graham, Mary) (Filed on 4/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland - To be determined. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial (Removal Complaint) by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company [refer to docket 1-9, page 2 of 15]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial (Removal Complaint) byAbbott Laboratories - [refer to docket 1-8, page 2 of 17]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Abbott Laboratories of re 2 Case Assigned by Intake, re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Proof of Service) (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Abbott Laboratories (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV008511, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17107698). Filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste M. Brecht, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Addendum Regarding Related Cases)(Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 4/21/2022) Modified on 4/22/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant