This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 09:34:11 (UTC).

THOMAS et al v. LEON COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 THOMAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LEON COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L HINKLE, MARTIN A FITZPATRICK and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L HINKLE

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONNIE BROWN

ARAZIA OLIVER

RANYAH FARRIS

RONNAISA BROWN

Defendants

ALL CORN

TALLAHASSEE POLICE DEPARTMENT

LEON COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

CHRISTOPHER JACOBS

CITY HALL

LYNE ZACHARY

FDLE

CAPITAL HOSPITAL

COCKERHAM

ZACHARY HOOVER

FBI

WALTER MCNEIL

REVELL

BOND CLINIC

COMCAST CABLE

LEON COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT

7 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER. Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. Plaintiff's initial in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's motion requesting the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #8 , is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's successive "amended complaint" submitted on March 24, 2021, must be deemed to be Plaintiff's "second amended complaint," ECF No. #10 , and the Clerk of Court shall correct the docket accordingly. Plaintiff's successive "amended complaint" submitted on March 25, 2021, must be deemed to be Plaintiff's "third amended complaint," ECF No. #11 , and the Clerk of Court shall correct the docket accordingly. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with another civil rights complaint form for use by a non-prisoner. Plaintiff shall have until April 30, 2021, in which to file a "fourth amended complaint," properly titled and on the Court form. If Plaintiff no longer desires to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must file a notice of voluntary dismissal no later than April 30, 2021. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than April 30, 2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/31/21. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (blb) *Form Provided* (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#11

(#11) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by MARCIA A THOMAS (blb) Modified per ORDER #12 on 3/31/2021 (blb). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#10

(#10) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) Modified per ORDER #12 on 3/31/2021 (blb). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#9

(#9) DOCUMENTS filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with an in forma pauperis application packet and civil rights complaint form for use by a non-prisoner. Plaintiff shall have until 4/5/2021, in which to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a properly supported in forma pauperis motion. If Plaintiff no longer desires to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must file a notice of voluntary dismissal no later than 4/5/2021. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than 4/5/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/5/21. (blb) *Forms Provided as Directed* (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I disqualify myself from this case based on ownership of stock in a defendant. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/4/21. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. (blb)**Please use new Judge's initials for all future pleadings: 4:21cv111-MW/MAF** (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

1 #3

Part 4

1 #2

Part 3

1 #1

Part 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (blb)*No copies, No fee, Split document due to pdf size* (Entered: 03/03/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines per ORDER #12 : Notify Chambers on 4/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021. Plaintiff's notice of dismissal to be filed by 4/30/2021. (blb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. Plaintiff's initial in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's motion requesting the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #8 , is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's successive "amended complaint" submitted on March 24, 2021, must be deemed to be Plaintiff's "second amended complaint," ECF No. #10 , and the Clerk of Court shall correct the docket accordingly. Plaintiff's successive "amended complaint" submitted on March 25, 2021, must be deemed to be Plaintiff's "third amended complaint," ECF No. #11 , and the Clerk of Court shall correct the docket accordingly. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with another civil rights complaint form for use by a non-prisoner. Plaintiff shall have until April 30, 2021, in which to file a "fourth amended complaint," properly titled and on the Court form. If Plaintiff no longer desires to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must file a notice of voluntary dismissal no later than April 30, 2021. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than April 30, 2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/31/21. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (blb) *Form Provided* (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 DOCUMENTS, #10 Amended Complaint, #11 Pleadings. (blb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by MARCIA A THOMAS (blb) Modified per ORDER #12 on 3/31/2021 (blb). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) Modified per ORDER #12 on 3/31/2021 (blb). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCUMENTS filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with an in forma pauperis application packet and civil rights complaint form for use by a non-prisoner. Plaintiff shall have until 4/5/2021, in which to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a properly supported in forma pauperis motion. If Plaintiff no longer desires to proceed with this case, Plaintiff must file a notice of voluntary dismissal no later than 4/5/2021. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than 4/5/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/5/21. (blb) *Forms Provided as Directed* (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. (blb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I disqualify myself from this case based on ownership of stock in a defendant. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/4/21. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. (blb)**Please use new Judge's initials for all future pleadings: 4:21cv111-MW/MAF** (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se (blb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. (blb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARCIA A THOMAS. (blb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARCIA A THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (blb)*No copies, No fee, Split document due to pdf size* (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Revell is a litigant

Latest cases where LEON COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where FDLE OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where TALLAHASSEE POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant