This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 09:09:56 (UTC).

Thomas et al v. Brown

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02445

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United Nations High Commissioner for Human Rights

Jonesboro, GA 30237

United Nations

P. O. Box 524

Jonesboro, GA 30237

Government of the United States of America

Jonesboro, GA 30237

Dr. Shellielle S. Youhoing Nanan

Jonesboro, GA 30237

Patricia Thomas

Jonesboro, GA 30238

Edward E. Thomas

Jonesboro, GA 30238

Defendants

And All Others Similarly Situated

Magistrate Richard Brown

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) USCA Acknowledgment of #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Thomas and Edward E. Thomas. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 21-12475-H. (pjm) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (pjm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Thomas and Edward E. Thomas. (pjm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Clerk's Judgment and #5 Order by Edward E. Thomas and Patricia Thomas. (pjm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (jpk) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Government of the United States of America, Edward E. Thomas, Patricia Thomas, United Nations, United Nations High Commissioner for Human Rights, Shellielle S. Youhoing Nanan re #6 Clerk's Judgment and #5 Order. (jpk) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action (jpk)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's #3 Complaint and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/25/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Patricia Thomas, Shellielle Nanan, Edward Thomas, Government of the US, United Nations and United Nations of High Commissioner for Human Rights as to Government of the United States of America, Edward E. Thomas, Patricia Thomas, United Nations, United Nations High Commissioner for Human Rights and Shellielle S. Youhoing Nanan regarding #4 Order. (mlb) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Complaint for Mandamus Relief to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross for frivolity review. (jpk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by United Nations High Commissioner for Human Rights, Edward E. Thomas, Government of the United States of America, Patricia Thomas, Shellielle S. Youhoing Nanan, United Nations. (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Government of the United States of America, Edward E. Thomas, Patricia Thomas, United Nations, United Nations High Commissioner for Human Rights, Shellielle S. Youhoing Nanan re #2 Order. (jpk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The undersigned defers to the District Judge any determination as to whether the filing is frivolous, including whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and ought to be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), along with any instructions to the parties regarding service and case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 6/21/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge Larkins referred on the case in error. He is assigned to rule on IFP only. (aar) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Edward E. Thomas and Patricia Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus Prohibition, #2 Petition - Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Nations is a litigant

Latest cases where All Others Similarly Situated is a litigant