This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 07:09:16 (UTC).

Thomas E. Andrews et al v. Mathew J. Michalski et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Thomas E Andrews filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mathew J Michalski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas E. Andrews

Midvale, UT 84047

The Estate of Thomas Earl Andrews

P.O. Box 22

Midvale, UT 84047

Ashley Poth

John Doe

Jane Doe

Defendants

Mathew J. Michalski

Ruthellen Anna Sheflin

Christoper Baysinger

Jackie Baysinger

Alyssa Howard

Steven Howard

Terry Howard

Christen Martinez

Katie Brown

Nicolette Payne

Russell Roberts

Karri A Michalski

John M. Michalski

Savanna Michalski

Marge Michalski

11 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#6) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court hereby sets a Status Conference in the above captioned matter for 8/11/2022 at 11:30 AM. The hearing shall proceed on Zoom. See document for further information. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshals (FRCP 4(c)(3), 28 USC section 1915) filed by plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (jp) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COURT OF, NOTICE MAILED TO RUTHLLEN ANNA SHEFLIN filed by plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (jp) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTES OF Status Conference before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Hearing held on Zoom. The court directs the clerk's office to prepare a low number order to SACV 21-00787-JVS (DFMx) for Judge Selna's review and determination if these actions are related and should be handled by the same judge. The Court takes the matter under submission. No further action shall be taken by the court until the pending issue of possible transfer to Judge Selna is resolved. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge James V. Selna, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:21-cv-00787-JVS-DFMx (dta) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED PLEADING by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Plaintiffs may file an amended pleading within twenty-one (21) days of service of this Order. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Christoper Baysinger, Jackie Baysinger, Katie Brown, Linda Church, Alyssa Howard, Steven Howard, Terry Howard, Carol Larson, Christen Martinez, John M. Michalski, Karri A Michalski, Marge Michalski, Mathew J. Michalski, Mathew J. Michalski, Jr, Savanna Michalski, Nicolette Payne, Russell Roberts, Ruthellen Anna Sheflin, The Estate of Matthew J Michalski, Matthew J Michalski Trust, Mathew J Michalski and Robin Anna Michalski Trust, Surtec Insurance, Travelers Insurance, The Estate of Terry Howard, Dose 1, through 10, Roes 1, through 10 amending Complaint - (Discovery) #1 , filed by plaintiffs The Estate of Thomas Earl Andrews, Thomas E. Andrews (an individual), Jane Doe, Thomas E. Andrews (administrator for The Andrews Children's Trust, a Utah Trust, with Thomas E Andrews as Trustee), Ashley Poth, John Doe. (jp) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Christoper Baysinger, Jackie Baysinger, Katie Brown, Linda Church, Alyssa Howard, Steven Howard, Terry Howard, Carol Larson, Christen Martinez, John M. Michalski, Karri A Michalski, Marge Michalski, Mathew J. Michalski, Mathew J. Michalski, Jr, Savanna Michalski, Nicolette Payne, Russell Roberts, Ruthellen Anna Sheflin, The Estate of Matthew J Michalski, Matthew J Michalski Trust, Mathew J Michalski and Robin Anna Michalski Trust, Surtec Insurance, Travelers Insurance, The Estate of Terry Howard, Dose 1, through 10, Roes 1, through 10 amending Complaint - (Discovery) #1 , filed by plaintiffs The Estate of Thomas Earl Andrews, Thomas E. Andrews (an individual), Jane Doe, Thomas E. Andrews (administrator for The Andrews Children's Trust, a Utah Trust, with Thomas E Andrews as Trustee), Ashley Poth, John Doe. (jp) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED PLEADING by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Plaintiffs may file an amended pleading within twenty-one (21) days of service of this Order. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge James V. Selna, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:21-cv-00787-JVS-DFMx (dta) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES OF Status Conference before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Hearing held on Zoom. The court directs the clerk's office to prepare a low number order to SACV 21-00787-JVS (DFMx) for Judge Selna's review and determination if these actions are related and should be handled by the same judge. The Court takes the matter under submission. No further action shall be taken by the court until the pending issue of possible transfer to Judge Selna is resolved. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COURT OF, NOTICE MAILED TO RUTHLLEN ANNA SHEFLIN filed by plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (jp) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshals (FRCP 4(c)(3), 28 USC section 1915) filed by plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (jp) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court hereby sets a Status Conference in the above captioned matter for 8/11/2022 at 11:30 AM. The hearing shall proceed on Zoom. See document for further information. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, filed by Plaintiffs The Estate of Thomas Earl Andrews, Thomas E. Andrews (an individual), Thomas E. Andrews (administrator for The Andrews Children's Trust, a Utah Trust, with Thomas E Andrews as Trustee), Ashley Poth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less