This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:52 (UTC).

Thomas v. Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Thomas filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Alfred A Arraj United States Courthouse. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03265

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Devin Wayne Thomas

Denver, CO 80201-1108

Respondent

Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Ryan Alan Crane

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Response by Respondent Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse. (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

11 #1

A

#3

(#3) ORDER to File Preliminary Response. ORDERED that Respondent State of Colorado Attorney General shall file a Preliminary Response within twenty-one days from the date of this Order that complies with this Order. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/19/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number COX092836), filed by Devin Wayne Thomas.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to resend ECF Nos. 1, 2, and 3 to Applicant at the correct address. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/03/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #3 Order, to File Preliminary Response by Respondent Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse. (Attachments: #1 A)(Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order to File Preliminary Response, Addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Case Assigned to Judge addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Certificate of Service Addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER. Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Respondents shall have up to and including January 8, 2020, to file a Preliminary Response that complies with the Order to File Pre-Answer Response, ECF No. #3 . Applicant, within thirty days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response, may reply if he desires. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/10/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to #3 Order, to File Preliminary Response by Respondent Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse. (Attachments: #1 A)(Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER. Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Respondents shall have up to and including January 8, 2020, to file a Preliminary Response that complies with the Order to File Pre-Answer Response, ECF No. #3 . Applicant, within thirty days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response, may reply if he desires. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/10/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Response by Respondent Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse. (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Certificate of Service Addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order to File Preliminary Response, Addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to resend ECF Nos. 1, 2, and 3 to Applicant at the correct address. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/03/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Case Assigned to Judge addressed to Devin Wayne Thomas. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to File Preliminary Response. ORDERED that Respondent State of Colorado Attorney General shall file a Preliminary Response within twenty-one days from the date of this Order that complies with this Order. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/19/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number COX092836), filed by Devin Wayne Thomas.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.