Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:52:08 (UTC).

Thoennes v. Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Thoennes filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00911

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julianna M Thoennes

Defendants

Robinson Tait P.S.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.

Benton County Sheriff's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Cochran

Attorney at Pacific Property Law LLC

1021 Se Sunnyside Rd, Suite 300

Clackamas, OR 97015

Samuel Hernandez

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1 Sw Columbia St., Suite 1900

Portland, OR 97204

Peter A. Talevich

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (Seattle)

925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Gregory N. Blase

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

State Street Financial Center, One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Eleanor A. DuBay

Attorney at Tomasi Salyer Baroway

121 Sw Morrison St., Suite 1850

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Stipulated Stipulation Dismissal of Action by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Joinder in Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance of Eleanor A. DuBay appearing on behalf of Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#11

(#11) Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and without an Award of Costs or Attorneys' Fees. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Talevich, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Talevich for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5885832 issued. Signed on 6/11/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory N. Blase for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5885827 issued. Signed on 6/11/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter A. Talevich . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885832. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory N. Blase . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885827. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV21276 from Benton County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885800 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1). (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Stipulated Stipulation Dismissal of Action by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss #11 as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Joinder in Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Appearance of Eleanor A. DuBay appearing on behalf of Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. (DuBay, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and without an Award of Costs or Attorneys' Fees. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Talevich, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#9) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Peter A. Talevich (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: patalevich. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Talevich for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5885832 issued. Signed on 6/11/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#7) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Gregory N. Blase (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: gnblase. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory N. Blase for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5885827 issued. Signed on 6/11/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter A. Talevich . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885832. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory N. Blase . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885827. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV21276 from Benton County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5885800 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1). (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benton County Sheriff's Office is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA PACIFIC MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Cochran