This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:57:20 (UTC).

Thimios v. ARS National Service Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Thimios filed an Other lawsuit against ARS National Service Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02409

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Thimios

Defendant

ARS National Service Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P Carlin

Attorney at Suburban Legal Group

1305 Remington Road, Suite C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Defendant Attorney

Raseq Moizuddin

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice until 7/15/2020, at which time it will become with prejudice pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelly Thimios (Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be due by 6/18/2020. Initial status hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Raseq Moizuddin for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant ARS National Service Inc. for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading (First Unopposed) (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ARS National Service Inc. by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Thimios as to Kelly Thimios on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelly Thimios by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kelly Thimios; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16941984. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice until 7/15/2020, at which time it will become with prejudice pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelly Thimios (Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be due by 6/18/2020. Initial status hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Raseq Moizuddin for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant ARS National Service Inc. for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading (First Unopposed) (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ARS National Service Inc. by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Thimios as to Kelly Thimios on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ARS National Service Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelly Thimios by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kelly Thimios; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16941984. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less