This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2020 at 13:19:40 (UTC).

Thibodeaux Billodeaux et al v. Ethicon Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Thibodeaux Billodeaux filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Criag Billodeaux

Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux

Defendants

Ethicon L L C

Ethicon Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanin Specter

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

Susan M Robinson

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P O Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

David B Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P O Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

William M Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow (MS)

P O Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Christy D Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow (MS)

P O Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

 

Court Documents

#50

49 #5

Exhibit C-Feld Report

49 #4

Exhibit B-Plaintiff Fact Sheet

49 #3

Exhibit A-Deposition of Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux

49 #2

Statement of material facts

49 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#49

#48

#47

#8

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

177 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 4/29/2020 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Statement of material facts, #3 Exhibit A-Deposition of Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux, #4 Exhibit B-Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #5 Exhibit C-Feld Report)(aty,Capodice, Camala) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shanin Specter terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/4/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #47 MOTION to Withdraw Shanin Specter & Michelle L. Tiger as Attorney. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/3/2020. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION to Withdraw Shanin Specter & Michelle L. Tiger as Attorney by Criag Billodeaux, Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Service)(aty,Balefsky, Lee) Modified on 3/3/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lee B Balefsky for Criag Billodeaux, Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/18/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/14/2020. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for Lee Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4182745) by Criag Billodeaux, Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing PA, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Heather A Cross added to party Criag Billodeaux(pty:pla))(aty,Cross, Heather) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Christopher A Gomez for Criag Billodeaux, Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/13/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #7 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Michelle Owens on 3/9/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Criag Billodeaux, Dana Thibodeaux-Billodeaux. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 95 (AGREED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ADDITIONAL COOK ENTITIES IN ALL CASES) entered on 01/17/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 01/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2896687. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/23/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William M Gage