This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 06:56:22 (UTC).

Thibeaux v. Unknown Psychiatrist et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Thibeaux filed an Other lawsuit against Unknown Psychiatrist. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

**Sanctioned/Barred* Rayfield Joseph Thibeaux

Washington, DC 20037

Defendants

Unknown Psychiatrist

Burl Cain

Warden Van Buren

Tom Desport

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BURL CAIN, TOM DESPORT, UNKNOWN PSYCHIATRIST, VAN BUREN with Jury Demand filed by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box as mailing address by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03096. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER that within 30 days from the filing date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint listing Plaintiff's full residence or a separate motion setting forth reasons to use a P.O. Box address. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order within the time provided may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2019. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/23/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Have Summons and Complaint Served by U.S. Marshal's Office by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03096. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, pursuant to the Court Order entered 1/24/2020. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/23/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box as mailing address by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that within 30 days from the filing date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint listing Plaintiff's full residence or a separate motion setting forth reasons to use a P.O. Box address. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order within the time provided may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2019. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Have Summons and Complaint Served by U.S. Marshal's Office by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BURL CAIN, TOM DESPORT, UNKNOWN PSYCHIATRIST, VAN BUREN with Jury Demand filed by RAYFIELD JOSEPH THIBEAUX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/16/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.