This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:14:31 (UTC).

Thermaltake Technology Co., Ltd. v. Phanteks USA Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Thermaltake Technology Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Phanteks USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10147

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.

Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.

Defendant

Phanteks USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie Mei Cheng

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael Wolak, III

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

3333 Piedmont Rd Ne Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30305

Daniel A Solitro

Attorney at Lock Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

Gary F Wang

Attorney at Law Offices of Gary F Wang

448 South Pasadena Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91105-1838

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD., (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

6 #1

CV-11C

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Wolak III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc., (Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#1

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Phanteks USA Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Attorney Gary F Wang added to party Phanteks USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Phanteks USA Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Attorney Gary F Wang added to party Phanteks USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 1/23/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Phanteks USA Inc. did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#17

(#17) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10147 AB(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-10147 CAS (SKx). (esa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc., (Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • (#20) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On January 9, 2020, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on January 13, 2020. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Phanteks USA Inc. answer now due 1/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Phanteks USA Inc..(Attorney Gary F Wang added to party Phanteks USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Wang, Gary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 1/23/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Phanteks USA Inc. did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10147 AB(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-10147 CAS (SKx). (esa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Phanteks USA Inc. (sbou) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Wolak III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD., (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24860831 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.. (Attorney Jamie Mei Cheng added to party Thermaltake Technology Co., LTD.(pty:pla))(Cheng, Jamie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less