This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 08:28:37 (UTC).

Thermal Edge Inc v. The Cincinnati Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Thermal Edge Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02117

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thermal Edge, Inc.

Thermal Edge Inc

Defendant

The Cincinnati Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey T Embry

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Christopher Patrick Peirce

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

4733 Don Drive

Dallas, TX 75247

Margaret Claire Pennell

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

515 S Vine Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick M Kemp

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Avenuesuite 800

Austin, TX 78701

Robert Glen Wall

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Avesuite 800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to The Cincinnati Casualty Company. (mla) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Patrick M Kemp added to party The Cincinnati Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/20/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/20/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Patrick M Kemp added to party The Cincinnati Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to The Cincinnati Casualty Company. (mla) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thermal Edge, Inc.. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Thermal Edge, Inc.. (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Cincinnati Casualty Company filed by Thermal Edge, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12193983) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Peirce, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Glen Wall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M. Kemp