This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:52:48 (UTC).

Theriot et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Theriot filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01170

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Douglas Theriot

Sandra Theriot

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas A Filo

Attorney at Cox Cox et al

723 Broad St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Quinn Walker

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Christopher P Ieyoub

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

V Ed McGuire, III

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5089866) filed by Douglas Theriot, Sandra Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Thomas A Filo added to party Douglas Theriot(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas A Filo added to party Sandra Theriot(pty:pla))(aty,Filo, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Theriot. All Defendants. (aty,Filo, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attorney Richard Quinn Walker added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attorney Richard Quinn Walker added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Theriot, Sandra Theriot. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to indicate State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 5/23/22; answer due date 6/13/22. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 6/3/2022 to add document number. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Theriot. All Defendants. (aty,Filo, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5089866) filed by Douglas Theriot, Sandra Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Thomas A Filo added to party Douglas Theriot(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas A Filo added to party Sandra Theriot(pty:pla))(aty,Filo, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant