This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:43:23 (UTC).

Theresa Brooke v. Sunstone LA Airport LLC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Theresa Brooke filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Sunstone LA Airport LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05142

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Brooke

Defendants

Sunstone LA Airport LLC

Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC

Sunstone LA Airport LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Renaissance Los Angeles Airport Hotel

Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC doing business as Renaissance Los Angeles Airport Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at Strojnik Firm LLC

2415 East Camelback Road Suite 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #10 filed July 20, 2019, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for August 12, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2019)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sunstone LA Airport LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23910992 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #10 filed July 20, 2019, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for August 12, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Renaissance Hotel Management Company LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sunstone LA Airport LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23910992 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone LA Airport LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Kristofer Strojnik