This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:23:59 (UTC).

Theresa Brooke v. BBC Esmeralda, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Theresa Brooke filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BBC Esmeralda, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Brooke

Defendants

BBC Esmeralda, LLC

Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC

BBC Esmeralda, LLC an Illinois corporation doing business as Renaissance Indian Wells Resort and Spa

Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC doing business as Renaissance Indian Wells Resort & Spa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Kristofer Strojnik

Attorney at Strojnik Firm LLC

2415 East Camelback Road Suite 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been settled by a Notice of Settlement #9 filed on February 21, 2019, here by orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#8

(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BBC Esmeralda, LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23080409 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been settled by a Notice of Settlement #9 filed on February 21, 2019, here by orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BBC Esmeralda, LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23080409 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Management Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer P. Kristofer Strojnik