This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2020 at 08:08:50 (UTC).

Theragun, Inc. v. Lifepro Fitness, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Theragun, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Lifepro Fitness, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02442

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theragun, Inc.

Defendants

Lifepro Fitness, LLC.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Remi T Salter

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Rod S Berman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Jessica Bromall Sparkman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Gregory S Cordrey

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintff Theragun, Inc., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #10 served on 03/23/20. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Theragun, Inc., upon Plaintiff Lifepro Fitness, LLC. served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lifepro Fitness, LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) *Request for Summons* Filed as SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Salter, Remi) Modified on 3/17/2020 (et). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., identifying Theragun, Inc.; Lifepro Fitness, LLC. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25726854 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Remi T Salter added to party Theragun, Inc.(pty:pla))(Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintff Theragun, Inc., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #10 served on 03/23/20. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Theragun, Inc., upon Plaintiff Lifepro Fitness, LLC. served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lifepro Fitness, LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *Request for Summons* Filed as SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Salter, Remi) Modified on 3/17/2020 (et). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., identifying Theragun, Inc.; Lifepro Fitness, LLC. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25726854 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Remi T Salter added to party Theragun, Inc.(pty:pla))(Salter, Remi) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THERAGUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Bromall Sparkman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Remi T Salter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rod S. Berman