Theragun, Inc. v. Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR TRADE DRESS AND PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against DOES 1 through 10, Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3536815.) - filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) D869, 387 S ;D879, 958 S ;D880, 714 S ;D880, 715 S ;10,702,448, B2 ;10,857,067 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Theragun, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theragun, Inc.. Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stanley M. Gibson, Rod S. Berman, Shenel Ozisik and Gregory S. Cordrey - filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stanley M. Gibson, Rod S. Berman, Shenel Ozisik and Gregory S. Cordrey filed by Theragun, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/26/2021. (fms) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2021 - filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2021 filed by Theragun, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC answer due 4/15/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/2/2021. (fms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/19/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Counsel for Plaintiff shall coordinate the call and email the dial-in information to chambers. If there are no issues about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/20/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order -- re #11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, by Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly)(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketThe 5/19/2021 Scheduling Conference is canceled per the filing of the unopposed scheduling order. (nmf) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 5/31/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/10/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2022. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 2/21/2022. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2023. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/29/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 4/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/18/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Theragun, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Theragun, Inc..(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Echelon Fitness Multimedia LLC's Initial Disclosures filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED ORDER -- Proposed Protective Order -- by Theragun, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/10/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/16/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Echelon Fitness Multimedia LLCs Amended Initial Disclosures and Defendant Echelon Fitness Multimedia LLCs Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Theragun, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery - filed by Theragun, Inc..(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Adopting District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") - by Theragun, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SO ORDERED, re #20 STIPULATION and Order Adopting District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.'s Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Theragun, Inc..(Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Andrew M. Moshos) by Theragun, Inc. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's List of Claim Terms/Phrases Needing Construction and Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.'s Disclosure of Proposed Claim Terms and Constructions for U.S. Patent Nos. D869,387; D879,985; D880,714; D880,715; 10,702,448; and 10,857,064 filed by Theragun, Inc..(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CLAIM Construction Chart by Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '387 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '985 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '714 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '715 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '448 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '064 Patent)(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION Adopt Claim Construction Positions Set Forth in the Joint Claim Construction Chart re #25 Notice of Service - filed by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION Claim Construction re #27 Claim Construction Chart, - filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/8/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement by Echelon Fitness Multimedia, LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/1/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less