This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 14:49:32 (UTC).

Theragun, Inc. v. Complete Recovery et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Theragun, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Complete Recovery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03821

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Theragun, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Revolution Hustle LLC

Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd.

Complete Recovery

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Elevate Brands LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Remi T Salter

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Gregory S Cordrey

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Jessica Bromall Sparkman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rod S Berman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Gregory S. Cordrey

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

3 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Stanley M Gibson

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Remi Salter

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Rosario L Vizzie

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

120 Broadway Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

Alfred Shaumyan

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

120 Broadway Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

Ellen E. Whitehorn

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

211 North Broadway Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

J Bennett Clark

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

211 North Broadway Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102

Matthew G. Minder

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

211 North Broadway Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Nancy Franco

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

120 Broadway Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

66 #12

Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Renewed Default Judgment and Permanent

66 #11

Exhibit J to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #10

Exhibit I to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #9

Exhibit H to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #8

Exhibit G to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #7

Exhibit F to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #5

Exhibit D to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey

66 #1

Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER GRANTING RENEWED DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT DEZHOU CREATIVE FITNESS EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, #66 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: theragun's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment against Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd is GRANTED on the claims set forth in the Complaint. Dezhou has infringed Theragun's rights in its Trade Dress. Dezhou is TEMPORARILY PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENTLY ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from using the federally registered trademark THERAGUN, U.S. Reg No. 5,213,141 or any other mark or trade dress confusingly similar. Judgment is entered in the amount of $3,892,410. FINAL JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor or Plaintiff Teraragun and against Defendant Dezhou, on all counts of Plaintiff's Complaint. See order for more information. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., re Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd #66 served on September 15, 2021. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co. Ltd, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Gregory S. Cordrey, #12 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Renewed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd) (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER, #56 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: It is Ordered that the motion for default judgment be, and hereby is, Denied without prejudice. (shb) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: On the Court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for June 21, 2021, is hereby ordered vacated and off calendar. No appearance is needed on June 21, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alfred Shaumyan counsel for Defendants Complete Recovery, Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC, Counter Claimants Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC. Alfred Shaumyan will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Complete Recovery; Revolution Hustle, LLC and Elevate Brands, LLC. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alfred Shaumyan counsel for Defendants Complete Recovery, Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC, Counter Claimants Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC. Ellen E. Whitehorn will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Complete Recovery; Revolution Hustle, LLC and Elevate Brands, LLC. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alfred Shaumyan counsel for Defendants Complete Recovery, Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC, Counter Claimants Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC. J. Bennett Clark will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Complete Recovery; Revolution Hustle, LLC and Elevate Brands, LLC. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alfred Shaumyan counsel for Defendants Complete Recovery, Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC, Counter Claimants Elevate Brands LLC, Revolution Hustle LLC. Matthew G, Minder will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Complete Recovery; Revolution Hustle, LLC and Elevate Brands, LLC. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: On the Court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for June 14, 2021, is hereby ordered continued to June 21, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are reminded that all pretrial documents are due no later than 21 days before the final pretrial conference hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. See ordered for further details. (shb) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc., identifying Theragun, Inc., Complete Recovery, Revolution Hustle LLC, Dezhou Create Fitness Equipment Co., Ltd.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-02442 (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26236487 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theragun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Attorney Remi T Salter added to party Theragun, Inc.(pty:pla))(Salter, Remi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Complete Recovery Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where THERAGUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Elevate Brands, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Bromall Sparkman