This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:19:05 (UTC).

THERAGUN, INC. v. GOLOVAN LTD.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 THERAGUN, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GOLOVAN LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23285

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THERAGUN, INC.

Defendant

GOLOVAN LTD. an Israel limited company doing business as GETKRAFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Ralph Jimenez

Attorney at GrayRobinson, P.A.

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Gregory S. Cordrey

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rod S. Berman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Elio F. Martinez, Jr.

Attorney at Espinosa Martinez LP

1428 Brickell Avenue, Suite 100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summon(s)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Complaint with Exhibits

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to GOLOVAN LTD. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rod S. Berman, Gregory S. Cordrey, mailing date September 13, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rod S. Berman, Gregory S. Cordrey, mailing date September 13, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GOLOVAN LTD. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GOLOVAN LTD., d/b/a GETKRAFT, an Israel limited company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15001848, filed by THERAGUN, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Martinez, Elio) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THERAGUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elio F. Martinez, Jr.(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Ralph Jimenez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rod S. Berman