This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 12:40:08 (UTC).

Therabody, Inc. v. NJOIE et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Therabody, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against NJOIE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09726

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Therabody, Inc.

Defendants

NJOIE

Boss Audio Systems

Ava Enterprises, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory S. Cordrey

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

3 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Jessica Bromall Sparkman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rod S Berman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

Defendant Attorneys

Kent Brian Goss

Attorney at Crowell Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark M. Supko

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Courts April 19, 2022 Scheduling Conference is hereby vacated and taken OFF CALENDAR. The matter is suitable without a hearing. No appearance necessary on April 19, 2022, the Court sets the following dates: Last Day to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties: July 1, 2022.; Joint Claim Construction Statement Cut-Off: November 14, 2022.; Claim Construction Discovery Cut-Off: November 28, 2022.; Simultaneous Opening ClaimConstruction Briefs Cut-Off: December 19, 2022.; Simultaneous Responsive ClaimConstruction Briefs Cut-Off: January 9, 2023.; Claim Construction/MarkmanHearing: January 24, 2023 at 10:00 am.; Updated Joint Report Cut-Off: February 21, 2023.; Further Scheduling Conference: February 28, 2023 at 10:00 am. (shb) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11 days before trial. (shb) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#23

(#23) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc... (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#22

(#22) (IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference is set for 4/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (cj) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Mark M. Supko APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE, designating Kent B. Goss as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

18 #3

Proposed Order

18 #2

DC Certificate of Good Standing

18 #1

NY Certificate of Good Standing

18 #18

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc., identifying NJOIE, Boss Audio Systems, and Ava Enterprises, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Courts April 19, 2022 Scheduling Conference is hereby vacated and taken OFF CALENDAR. The matter is suitable without a hearing. No appearance necessary on April 19, 2022, the Court sets the following dates: Last Day to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties: July 1, 2022.; Joint Claim Construction Statement Cut-Off: November 14, 2022.; Claim Construction Discovery Cut-Off: November 28, 2022.; Simultaneous Opening ClaimConstruction Briefs Cut-Off: December 19, 2022.; Simultaneous Responsive ClaimConstruction Briefs Cut-Off: January 9, 2023.; Claim Construction/MarkmanHearing: January 24, 2023 at 10:00 am.; Updated Joint Report Cut-Off: February 21, 2023.; Further Scheduling Conference: February 28, 2023 at 10:00 am. (shb) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11 days before trial. (shb) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc... (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) (IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference is set for 4/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (cj) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Mark M. Supko APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE, designating Kent B. Goss as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE, (Goss, Kent) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE.(Goss, Kent) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark M. Supko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/4/2022, Receipt No. 5203105) filed by Defendant Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Goss, Kent) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kent Brian Goss on behalf of Defendants Ava Enterprises, Inc., Boss Audio Systems, NJOIE (Attorney Kent Brian Goss added to party Ava Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kent Brian Goss added to party Boss Audio Systems(pty:dft), Attorney Kent Brian Goss added to party NJOIE(pty:dft))(Goss, Kent) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER ON SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION TO RESPOND, #15 , by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The deadline for defendants NJOIE, Boss Audio Systems, and Ava Enterprises 22 to respond to the Complaint is on or before February 7, 2022. Defendants Ava Enterprises, Inc. answer due 2/7/2022; Boss Audio Systems answer due 2/7/2022 (shb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc., identifying NJOIE, Boss Audio Systems, and Ava Enterprises, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32489727 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Gregory S. Cordrey added to party Therabody, Inc.(pty:pla))(Cordrey, Gregory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Therabody, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ava Enterprises, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent B Goss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark M Supko