This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2021 at 09:40:55 (UTC).

Theodor Atanuspour v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Theodor Atanuspour filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06644

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodor Atanuspour

Defendant

Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter S Sessions

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Corinne Chandler

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorney

Francis J Torrence

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

525 Market Street 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order Extend time to respond to complant

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, identifying Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is accepted as filed. Local Rule 7.11 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel shall file their Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspourto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #11 [Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution] (Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #12 . The Court grants the Stipulation, giving Defendant Reliance up to September 24, 2021 to file a responsive pleading. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company answer now due 9/24/2021, filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extend time to respond to complant)(Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2021.) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspour, upon Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - Authorized Agent at C T Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (ghap) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspour, (Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspour. (Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspour. (Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31822639 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Theodor Atanuspour. (Attorney Peter S Sessions added to party Theodor Atanuspour(pty:pla))(Sessions, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis Jude Torrence