This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 23:10:16 (UTC).

Thee Aguila, Inc. et al v. Admiral Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Thee Aguila, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Admiral Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09650

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thee Aguila, Inc.

Henry Aguila

Defendants

Admiral Insurance Company

Does 1-10, inclusive

Not Classified By Court

Century Law Group LLP

Pico Rivera First Mortgage Investors, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie N. Nong

Attorney at NT Law

2600 West Olive Avenue, 5Th Floor Suite 647

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Hobbs

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6546

Michael B Gelfound

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6546

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Thee Aguila, Inc.(Nong, Julie) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#18

(#18) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant Admiral Insurance Company(Gelfound, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#17

(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 DAYS, filed by Defendant Admiral Insurance Company.. (Gelfound, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (vv) (Entered: 02/06/2022)

15 #1

Supplement Certification and Notice of Interested Parties

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Creditor Pico Rivera First Mortgage Investors, LP. (Woosley, Eric) (Entered: 12/26/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/18/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Judgment Creditor Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/18/2021)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#10

(#10) Proof of Service of Notice of Lien in Pending Action filed by Creditor Century Law Group LLP re: Notice of Lien #5 (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Admiral Insurance Company. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Henry Aguila, Thee Aguila, Inc.. (Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32473669 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Thee Aguila, Inc., Henry Aguila. (Attorney Julie N Nong added to party Henry Aguila(pty:bkmov), Attorney Julie N Nong added to party Thee Aguila, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Thee Aguila, Inc.(Nong, Julie) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant Admiral Insurance Company(Gelfound, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 DAYS, filed by Defendant Admiral Insurance Company.. (Gelfound, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (vv) (Entered: 02/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Attorney Rachel Hobbs added to party Admiral Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hobbs, Rachel) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Creditor Pico Rivera First Mortgage Investors, LP. (Woosley, Eric) (Entered: 12/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Judgment Creditor Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proof of Service of Notice of Lien in Pending Action filed by Creditor Century Law Group LLP re: Notice of Lien #5 (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Admiral Insurance Company. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Century Law Group LLP. (Evanns, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Henry Aguila, Thee Aguila, Inc.. (Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Henry Aguila, Thee Aguila, Inc.. (Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Henry Aguila, Thee Aguila, Inc.. (Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32473669 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Thee Aguila, Inc., Henry Aguila. (Attorney Julie N Nong added to party Henry Aguila(pty:bkmov), Attorney Julie N Nong added to party Thee Aguila, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Nong, Julie) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PICO RIVERA FIRST MORTGAGE INVESTORS-LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Hobbs