Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2020 at 09:01:57 (UTC).

The Woodmont Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 The Woodmont Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Reed C. O'Connor and Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00489

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Reed C. O'Connor

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Woodmont Company

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R Pearson

Attorney at Pearson Legal, P.C.

425 Soledad, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78205

Marc M Gravely

Attorney at Gravely & Pearson LLP

425 Soledad St, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78205

Marc E Gravely

Attorney at Gravely & Pearson LLP

425 Soledad St, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78205

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Sparks Usery

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

George Howard Arnold

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Rhonda J Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Not Classified By Court Attorney

James J Juneau

Attorney at Gilbert Mediation Group

12001 North Central Expy, Suite 650

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The mediator notified the Court that after an August 29, 2019 mediation, this case has settled. See Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary ECF No. #12 . Although the Scheduling Order governing this case required the parties to file a joint report within seven days after mediation, no such report has been filed. See Scheduling Order at 5, ECF No. #10 . Therefore, the parties are directed to file appropriate dismissal papersa stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with corresponding proposed orderwith the Clerks Office on or before November 1, 2019. If further proceedings become necessary or desirable, the parties should immediately file a joint status report with the Court. All deadlines are stayed until further ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/8/2019) (tln) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#12

(#12) Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Matthew R. Pearson and George H. Arnold. Prv Fee: $ 1,500.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Juneau, James) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Motions due by 3/6/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/22/2020. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2020. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning July 20, 2020 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/22/2019) (skg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Pearson for Marc E. Gravely on behalf of The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#5

(#5) FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before July 23, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#11

(#11) Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (bdb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The mediator notified the Court that after an August 29, 2019 mediation, this case has settled. See Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary ECF No. #12 . Although the Scheduling Order governing this case required the parties to file a joint report within seven days after mediation, no such report has been filed. See Scheduling Order at 5, ECF No. #10 . Therefore, the parties are directed to file appropriate dismissal papersa stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with corresponding proposed orderwith the Clerks Office on or before November 1, 2019. If further proceedings become necessary or desirable, the parties should immediately file a joint status report with the Court. All deadlines are stayed until further ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/8/2019) (tln) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Matthew R. Pearson and George H. Arnold. Prv Fee: $ 1,500.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Juneau, James) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Motions due by 3/6/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/22/2020. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2020. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning July 20, 2020 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/22/2019) (skg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Pearson for Marc E. Gravely on behalf of The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Woodmont Company. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before July 23, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 67th Judicial District Court for Tarrant County, Texas, case number 067-308022-19 filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10069283) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODMONT COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J Juneau