Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:49:16 (UTC).

The Woodmont Company et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 The Woodmont Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John McBryde and Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John McBryde

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sycamore Village, L.P.

The Woodmont Company

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc M Gravely

Attorney at Gravely & Pearson LLP

425 Soledad St, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78205

Matthew R Pearson

Attorney at Gravely & Pearson LLP

425 Soledad, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78205

Defendant Attorneys

George Howard Arnold

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Susan Sparks Usery

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Rhonda J Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Zurich American Insurance Company filed by The Woodmont Company, Sycamore Village, L.P. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Sycamore Village, L.P., The Woodmont Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#8

(#8) PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL by Marc Gravely on behalf of Sycamore Village, L.P., The Woodmont Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on July 8, 2019, defendant file an amended notice of removal that pleads facts from which the court can infer that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to do so may result in the remand of this action to the state court from which it was removed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/24/2019) (tln) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/21/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#15

(#12) Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 352nd Judicial District Court for Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-308017-19 filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10069422) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • Clerk's notice to ECF Users in cases transferred under SO 3-329 from Judge John McBryde to Judge Mark Pittman: Judge Pittman permits electronic filing. His copy requirements for electronically filed documents are as follows: Sealed documents, dispositive motions, responses, replies, and appendices thereto and filings more than 25 pages in length, placed in a 3-ring binder, with exhibits or attachments tabbed, indexed, and bound. Delivery instructions are available in the link to the Judges' Copy Requirements found at the top of the notice of electronic filing sent to affected ECF users. (lrl) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Zurich American Insurance Company filed by The Woodmont Company, Sycamore Village, L.P. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR REPLEADING: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2019. Responses due by 8/20/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/23/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Sycamore Village, L.P., The Woodmont Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL by Marc Gravely on behalf of Sycamore Village, L.P., The Woodmont Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (tln) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on July 8, 2019, defendant file an amended notice of removal that pleads facts from which the court can infer that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to do so may result in the remand of this action to the state court from which it was removed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/24/2019) (tln) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/21/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 352nd Judicial District Court for Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-308017-19 filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10069422) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Arnold, George) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sycamore Village Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODMONT COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R. Pearson