This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2022 at 11:38:09 (UTC).

The Willows Condominium Association v. Insurance Company of Greater New York

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 The Willows Condominium Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Insurance Company of Greater New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04091

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Willows Condominium Association

Defendant

Insurance Company of Greater New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott David Green

Attorney at The Law Offices of Scott Green

P.O. Box 30016

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Ross Carlyon

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palendech Ponzi & Rudloff

222 N Lasalle Dr. #1400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Willows Condominium Association by Scott David Green (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Willows Condominium Association (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 10/17/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Willows Condominium Association. The Willows Condominium Association waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew Ross Carlyon (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Willows Condominium Association. Insurance Company of Greater New York waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Willows Condominium Association. Insurance Company of Greater New York waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insurance Company of Greater New York by Matthew Ross Carlyon (Carlyon, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Willows Condominium Association. The Willows Condominium Association waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 10/17/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Willows Condominium Association (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Willows Condominium Association by Scott David Green (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by The Willows Condominium Association; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19715746. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Green, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant