This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 08:45:51 (UTC).

The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Factory Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00951

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company

Defendant

Factory Mutual Insurance Company doing business as FM Global

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Griffith

Attorney at Griffith Davison & Shurtleff, P.C.

13737 Noel Road, Suite 850

Dallas, TX 75240

Jason L Cagle

Attorney at Griffith Davison, P.C.

13737 Noel Road, Suite 850

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendant Attorneys

Todd M Tippett

Attorney at Zelle LLP

901 Main Street, Ste. 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

Michael Patrick O'Brien

Attorney at Zelle LLP

901 Main St., Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75202

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Bryan D Bruner

Attorney at Bruner & Pappas LLP

3700 W 7Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76107

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning Monday, November 6, 2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/31/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Motions due by 7/31/2023. Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2023. The court appoints Bryan D Bruner as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/28/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Griffith on behalf of The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

6 #1

Cover Sheet

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) by October 28, 2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint; and (2) within 14 days after Plaintiff files the amended complaint, but no later than November 11, 2022, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 24, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Factory Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a FM Global. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit(s) E

1 #7

Exhibit(s) D

1 #6

Exhibit(s) C-4

1 #5

Exhibit(s) C-3

1 #4

Exhibit(s) C-2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning Monday, November 6, 2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/31/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Motions due by 7/31/2023. Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2023. The court appoints Bryan D Bruner as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/28/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Griffith on behalf of The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Griffith, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) by October 28, 2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint; and (2) within 14 days after Plaintiff files the amended complaint, but no later than November 11, 2022, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 24, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Factory Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a FM Global. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a FM Global. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13243688) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C-1, #4 Exhibit(s) C-2, #5 Exhibit(s) C-3, #6 Exhibit(s) C-4, #7 Exhibit(s) D, #8 Exhibit(s) E, #9 Exhibit(s) F) (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Factory Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan D Bruner