This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2022 at 05:59:39 (UTC).

Western Sugar Cooperative, The v. Dorn et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Western Sugar Cooperative, The filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dorn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00956

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Western Sugar Cooperative

Western Sugar Cooperative, The

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Dorn Agco LLC

Richard Dorn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle R. Gomez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Marc David Flink

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Paul J. Lopach

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203-4541

Stephen D. Rynerson

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203-4541

Cory Russell Laird

Attorney at Laird Cowley

2955 Stockyard Road

Missoula, MT 59808

 

Court Documents

#58

#57

#56

45 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#45

38 #3

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

38 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration

38 #1

Declaration of Marc D. Flink

#38

1 #10

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - Return of Service (Dorn Agco, LLC)

1 #7

Exhibit G - Return of Serivce (Richard Dorn)

1 #6

Exhibit F - Order granting Unopposed Motion to Complete SErvice

1 #5

Exhibit E - Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion to Complete Service

1 #4

Exhibit D - Unopposed Motion to Complete Service

1 #3

Exhibit C - Delay Reduction Order

1 #2

Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/2021, r: #38 plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff shall respond to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 28] on or before January 26, 2021. ORDERED that defendants may file any reply to plaintiff's response on or before February 9, 2021..(sphil, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/23/2020, re: #45 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED.(sphil, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/23/20 GRANTING #52 Motion for Leave to Restrict. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the following document UNDER RESTRICTION at LEVEL 1: (1) Plaintiff's Exhibit 4 [#49] and (2) Plaintiff's Exhibit 6 [#49-1]. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) REPLY to Response to #45 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Flink, Marc) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MEMORANDUM regarding #52 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Western Sugar Cooperative. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/2/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) BRIEF in Opposition to #45 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Counter Claimants Richard Dorn, Dorn Agco LLC, Defendants Richard Dorn, Dorn Agco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Richard A. Dorn)(Rynerson, Stephen) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery by Defendants Richard Dorn, Dorn Agco LLC. (Lopach, Paul) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits 4 and 6 to #48 REPLY to Response to 38 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative, The.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flink, Marc) Modified on 10/19/2020 to add linkage and document title. (sphil, ). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle R. Gomez on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative, TheAttorney Michelle R. Gomez added to party Western Sugar Cooperative, The(pty:pla) (Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc David Flink on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative, TheAttorney Marc David Flink added to party Western Sugar Cooperative, The(pty:pla) (Flink, Marc) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Dorn AGCO LLC on 5 March 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Richard Dorn on 5 March 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Richard Dorn, Dorn Agco LLC, filed by Western Sugar Cooperative, The.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rynerson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dorn Agco LLC, Richard Dorn from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV34846. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7238018), filed by Dorn Agco LLC, Richard Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit D - Unopposed Motion to Complete Service, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion to Complete Service, #6 Exhibit F - Order granting Unopposed Motion to Complete SErvice, #7 Exhibit G - Return of Serivce (Richard Dorn), #8 Exhibit H - Return of Service (Dorn Agco, LLC), #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopach, Paul) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Western Sugar Cooperative is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle R. Gomez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc David Flink