This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2019 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. v. Morrisey

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Morrisey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Copenhaver, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00434

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Copenhaver, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc.

Defendant

Patrick J. Morrisey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John David Fenwick

Attorney at GOODWIN & GOODWIN

P. O. Box 2107

Charleston, WV 25328-2107

Lucas R. White

Attorney at GOODWIN & GOODWIN

P. O. Box 2107

Charleston, WV 25328-2107

Deepak Gupta

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER

Suite 312, 1900 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Eric Tirschwell

Attorney at EVERYTOWN LAW

P. O. Box 4184

New York, NY 10017

Jonathan E. Taylor

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER

Suite 312, 1900 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

James Edward Miller

Attorney at EVERYTOWN LAW

P. O. Box 4184

New York, NY 10017

Alla Lefkowitz

Attorney at EVERYTOWN LAW

P. O. Box 4184

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsay Sara See

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Building 1, Room E-26

Charleston, WV 25305

Steven Andrew Travis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Building 1, Room E-26

Charleston, WV 25305

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT by Patrick J. Morrisey, The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. (Travis, Steven) (Modified on 7/1/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jonathan E. Taylor on behalf of The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. Local counsel: J. David Fenwick. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7287530. (Fenwick, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Deepak Gupta on behalf of The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. Local counsel: J. David Fenwick. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7287517. (Fenwick, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James Edward Miller on behalf of The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. Local counsel: J. David Fenwick. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7286399. (Fenwick, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Alla Lefkowitz on behalf of The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. Local counsel: J. David Fenwick. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7286382. (Fenwick, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Eric Tirschwell on behalf of The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. Local counsel: J. David Fenwick. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7286357. (Fenwick, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Patrick J. Morrisey, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Kerri Sheets. Patrick J. Morrisey served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER-FORM REQUEST to Rory L. Perry II, Clerk, from Lucas R. White dated 6/7/2019, requesting service of summons on Complaint to Defendant Patrick J. Morrisey by certified mail. (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff The West Virginia Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Inc. (White, Lucas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7270750. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alla Lefkowitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric A. Tirschwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucas R. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan E. Taylor