This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2021 at 09:40:18 (UTC).

The Watch Company Inc et al v. Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 The Watch Company Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Watch & Accessory Co doing business as The WatchCo doing business as WatchCo.com

The Watch Company Inc doing business as The WatchCo doing business as WatchCo.com

Defendant

Citizen Watch Company of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan T Smies

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

200 S Washington St - Ste 100

Green Bay, WI 54307-3067

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

#9

#10

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 09:30 AM is removed from the court calendar pending resolution of the #9 Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel) (tlf)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Seth Presser in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in Support filed by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc. (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc. (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #5 STIPULATION extending time to April 26, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to complaint, filed by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/26/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION Regarding Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by Citizen Watch Company of America Inc. (Smies, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (lh).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 4/22/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of John Wille (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Smies, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. from Outagamie County, Case Number: 21-CV-177 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3767627) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint)(Smies, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., a California Corporation (Successor to Bulova Corporation, a New York corporation) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan T Smies