This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:58:17 (UTC).

THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC. et al v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02763

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER

BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL

THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC.

VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY

STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA

OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC.

OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION

WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL

CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION

CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION

THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY

THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY

RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA

FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC

AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER

MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY

THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE

SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark D. Polston

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Thomas Craigmyle

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L St, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jason Todd Cohen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Compl

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint)(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jason T. Cohen (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2019. (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/19/2019. (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/20/2019 (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Declaration

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alek Pivec, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 200,Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 626-2914. Fax No. - (202) 626-3737 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6380389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380295) filed by THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alek Pivec is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint)(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jason T. Cohen (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2019. (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/19/2019. (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/20/2019 (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alek Pivec, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 200,Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 626-2914. Fax No. - (202) 626-3737 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6380389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380295) filed by THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Polston, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA is a litigant

Latest cases where VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY is a litigant