This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:37:03 (UTC).

United States of America v. The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank (Bahamas)

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank Bahamas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24379

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The United States of America

Miami, FL 33132

United States Of America

Defendants

The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank (Bahamas) Limited in the name of FCI Holdings, Inc.

The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank (BAHAMAS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole Grosnoff

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 N.E. 4Th Street

Miami, FL 33132

Nalina Sombuntham

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

99 N.E. 4Th Street

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report no later than 30 days after a claim is filed in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Order re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by United States Of America. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Interested Parties by Nicole Grosnoff on behalf of United States Of America (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States Of America (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by United States Of America Notice of Withdrawal as an Assistant United States Attorney for the United States of America (Sombuntham, Nalina) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by United States Of America Regarding Arrest Warrants In Rem (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #2

Civil Complaint Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank (Bahamas) Limited in the name of FCI Holdings, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet)(Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report no later than 30 days after a claim is filed in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Order re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by United States Of America. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Interested Parties by Nicole Grosnoff on behalf of United States Of America (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States Of America (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Nalina Sombuntham representing United States Of America (Plaintiff) terminated. PER DE#7 . (cds) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by United States Of America Notice of Withdrawal as an Assistant United States Attorney for the United States of America (Sombuntham, Nalina) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by United States Of America Regarding Arrest Warrants In Rem (Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 10/28/2020. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Nalina Sombuntham, Attorney added: Nalina Sombuntham for United States Of America Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ab01) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference, re: service on foreign defendant, set for 10/28/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above and wait for your case to be called. The access code is 3156459 and the security code is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A SPEAKER PHONE, AND AVOID USING A CELL PHONE IF POSSIBLE. (ps1) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against The Contents of Account Number 1374520 at Butterfield Bank (Bahamas) Limited in the name of FCI Holdings, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet)(Grosnoff, Nicole) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less