This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 07:48:28 (UTC).

The United States of America v. 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 The United States of America filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The United States of America

Defendants

4K Global - ACC JV, LLC

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jason Merbaum

Attorney at Merbaum & Becker, P.C.

Suite 284, 5755 North Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Andrew J. Becker

Attorney at Merbaum & Becker, P.C.

Suite 284, 5755 North Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Matthew Christopher Mikkelsen

Attorney at Merbaum & Becker, P.C.

Suite 284, 5755 North Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC Answer due 4/13/2020; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Answer due 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by The United States of America. 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Merbaum, David) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Joseph Watson. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Merbaum, David) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

3 #1

Summons Liberty Mutual

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Liberty Mutual)(tmf) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America f/u/b/o Joseph Watson Masonry, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (tmf) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The United States of America f/u/b/o Joseph Watson Masonry, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9286608) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC Answer due 4/13/2020; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Answer due 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by The United States of America. 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Merbaum, David) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Joseph Watson. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Merbaum, David) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to 4K Global - ACC JV, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Liberty Mutual)(tmf) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America f/u/b/o Joseph Watson Masonry, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (tmf) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The United States of America f/u/b/o Joseph Watson Masonry, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9286608) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.