This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 08:52:40 (UTC).

The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 The United States of America for the use and benefit of E G Middleton, Inc was filed as a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence R. Leonard and Raymond A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.

Defendant

Westfield Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Richard Harvey, III

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP (Norfolk)

101 West Main St, Suite 500

Norfolk, VA 23510

Daniel Allen Duane Salmon

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP (Norfolk)

101 West Main St, Suite 500

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorney

Noah Renard Meissner

Attorney at Watt Tieder Hoffar & Fitzgerald LLP

1765 Greensboro Station Place, Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/3/2020. (clou ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint for Westfield Insurance Company served on CT Corporation System on 8/17/2020, filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

4 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Westfield Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7347562.), filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRefer for 16(b) (tamarm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/3/2020. (clou ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (clou ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meissner, Noah) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint for Westfield Insurance Company served on CT Corporation System on 8/17/2020, filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Westfield Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7347562.), filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less