This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:30:43 (UTC).

The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02122

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Appellant

The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service

Appellee

Ford Steel, LLC

In Re

H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard A. Kincheloe

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

In Re and Appellee Attorney

Julie Mitchell Koenig

Attorney at Cooper and Scully

700 Louisiana St, Ste 3850

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER STAYING CASE, granting #12 Agreed MOTION to Abate (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Agreed MOTION to Abate by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#11

(#11) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 7/31/2019, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Andrew Hanen, Civil Action 4:19-cv-2122. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#10

(#10) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#9

(#9) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rick Kincheloe for Transcript of Status Conference on 7/8/19 before Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Kincheloe, Richard) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#8

(#8) Supplemental Notice of Appeal filed by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Original document filed in bankruptcy case 17-35027.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER. This case is hereby remanded to bankruptcy court. A status conference is set on 7/8/2019 at 10:00 a.m.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

3 #8

Proposed Order

3 #7

Exhibit G

3 #6

Exhibit F

3 #5

Exhibit E

3 #4

Exhibit D

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc., Ford Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Koenig, Julie) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER STAYING CASE, granting #12 Agreed MOTION to Abate (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Agreed MOTION to Abate by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 7/31/2019, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Andrew Hanen, Civil Action 4:19-cv-2122. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rick Kincheloe for Transcript of Status Conference on 7/8/19 before Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Kincheloe, Richard) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/8/2019. The parties gave the Court a status of the case. Appearances: Bruce J Ruzinsky, Julie Mitchell Koenig, Richard A. Kincheloe.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(rhawkins) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Supplemental Notice of Appeal filed by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. Original document filed in bankruptcy case 17-35027.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER. This case is hereby remanded to bankruptcy court. A status conference is set on 7/8/2019 at 10:00 a.m.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. MOTION HEARING held on 6/25/2019. The Court heard argument on #3 Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. The Court remands this case to the bankruptcy court to address the "subordination agreement" language. Order to follow. The Court further sets a status conference on this matter on 7/8/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Notice of Setting to follow. Appearances: Bruce J Ruzinsky, Julie Mitchell Koenig, Richard A. Kincheloe.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(rhawkins) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OBJECTIONS to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal , filed by Equitable Life & Casualty Insurance Company. (Ruzinsky, Bruce) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by H.C. Jeffries Tower Company, Inc., Ford Steel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Koenig, Julie) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by The United States of America acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On May 15, 2019 and June 10, 2019, The United States acting on behalf of its Internal Revenue Service filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge The Honorable Andrew S. Hanen, Civil Action 4:19cv2122. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal filed May 15, 2019, #2 Amended Notice of Appeal filed June 10, 2019, #3 Bankruptcy docket sheet)(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.