This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:26:22 (UTC).

The Typewritorium Company v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 The Typewritorium Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Travelers Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04816

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems

Defendants

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

The Travelers Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Cotton Molumphy

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Jerry K. Cimmet

4 Brittany Lane

Chico, CA 95926

John M. Kelson

Attorney at Law Office of John M. Kelson

483 Ninth Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Edward Goldman

Attorney at Robinson and Cole LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Wystan M Ackerman

Attorney at Robinson and Cole LLP

280 Trumbull St

Hartford, CT 06103

Andrew B. Downs

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

101 Montgomery St., Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Linda Beth Oliver

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

23 #7

Proposed Order

23 #6

Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice

23 #5

Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice

23 #4

Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice

23 #3

Request for Judicial Notice

23 #2

Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration

23 #1

Declaration of Kupec

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kupec, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Lack of Standing; Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Skjerven, #2 Declaration of Kupec, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems.. (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry K. Cimmet and John M. Kelson (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14707266.). Filed byThe Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kupec, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Lack of Standing; Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Skjerven, #2 Declaration of Kupec, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen E. Goldman.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Stephen E. Goldman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14917458.) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Goldman, Stephen) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wystan Ackerman.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14911530.) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ackerman, Wystan) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for 30 Day Extension to Respond to Complaint (LR 6-1(a)) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Typewritorium Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (30 day extension requested) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew B. Downs, #2 Exhibit A to Downs declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Downs declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Downs declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Beth Oliver (Oliver, Linda) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems.. (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry K. Cimmet and John M. Kelson (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14707266.). Filed byThe Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less