This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:04:58 (UTC).

THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC v. VAGNONI et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 THE TSG GRAT 9, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VAGNONI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02484

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI

PHILIP C. VAGNONI

DAVID E. VAGNONI

BARRY I. VAGNONI

LUCIANO VAGNONI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGG KANTER

Attorney at GREGG H. KANTER LAW OFFICE LLC

2222 Pine St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES J. PHILLIPS

Attorney at LEISAWITZ HELLER ABRAMOWITCH PHILLIPS PC

2755 Century Blvd

Wyomissing, PA 19610

PAUL F. TROISI

Attorney at Leisawitz Heller

2755 Century Blvd

Wyomissing, PA 19610

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; BARRY I. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; DAVID E. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; LUCIANO VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (KANTER, GREGG) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. TROISI on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(TROISI, PAUL) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

5 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. PHILLIPS on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PHILLIPS, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANTS by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/7/19. 6/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (mas, ). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198558.), filed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; BARRY I. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; DAVID E. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; LUCIANO VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (KANTER, GREGG) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. TROISI on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(TROISI, PAUL) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. PHILLIPS on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PHILLIPS, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/27/19 (jl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANTS by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/7/19. 6/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (mas, ). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Summons Issued as to THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI. 5 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/7/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198558.), filed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.