This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 08:21:48 (UTC).

The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 The Travelers Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09556

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Travelers Indemnity Company

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meg R. Reid

Attorney at Reid and Associates

P.O. Box 2996

Hartford, CT 06104-2996

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Gary Adams

Attorney at Coughlin Midlige & Garland LLP

88 Pine Street, 28Th Floorwall Street Plaza

New York, NY 10005

Noah Michael Wiesner

Attorney at Coughlin Midlige & Garland LLP

88 Pine Street, 28Th Floorwall Street Plaza

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/30/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER EXTENDINGTIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company, may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Michael Wiesner on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Wiesner, Noah) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Gary Adams on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Adams, Steven) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit Order - extend time to answer

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2021) (ks) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company..(pc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) Modified on 11/18/2021 (lb). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/30/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Steven G. Adams/Noah M. Wiesner dated 12/27/2021 re: Request for Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer).(Adams, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Michael Wiesner on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Wiesner, Noah) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Gary Adams on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company..(Adams, Steven) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER EXTENDINGTIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the time within which Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company, may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 1/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam Smith dated December 13, 2021 re: Request an extension of time to Answer the Complaint. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order - extend time to answer).(Smith, Adam) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2021) (ks) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company..(pc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Meg R. Reid to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not all Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) Modified on 11/18/2021 (lb). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25352409)Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement).(Reid, Meg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant