This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2021 at 08:30:57 (UTC).

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois et al v. Long Holdings Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Long Holdings Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois

The Travelers Indemnity Company of America

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Cross Defendants

Long Holdings Group, Inc.

Cincinnati Drum Service, Inc.

Longs Land Limited

Chubb Group of Insurance Companies

Great Northern Insurance Company

Federal Insurance Company

Continental Casualty Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Long Holdings Group, Inc.

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian H. Stephenson

Attorney at Ward, Hocker & Thornton PLLC - Louisville

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 700, Hurstbourne Place

Louisville, KY 40222

Kenneth C. Newa

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney - Bloomfield Hills

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Tanya M. Murray

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney - Bloomfield Hills

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Brian P. Halloran

Attorney at Brooking & Halloran PLLC

909 Wright'S Summit Parkway, Suite 220

Ft. Wright, KY 41011

John S. Brooking

Attorney at Brooking & Halloran PLLC

909 Wright'S Summit Parkway, Suite 220

Ft. Wright, KY 41011

David E. Williamson

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin - OH

312 Elm Street, Suite 1850

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Michael James Baughman

Attorney at Cohn & Baughman

333 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606-1284

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian P. Halloran

Attorney at Brooking & Halloran PLLC

909 Wright'S Summit Parkway, Suite 220

Ft. Wright, KY 41011

John S. Brooking

Attorney at Brooking & Halloran PLLC

909 Wright'S Summit Parkway, Suite 220

Ft. Wright, KY 41011

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

David E. Williamson

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin - OH

312 Elm Street, Suite 1850

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Michael James Baughman

Attorney at Cohn & Baughman

333 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606-1284

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) FIRST ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, with Jury Demand , FIRST COUNTERCLAIM of Long Holdings Group and Longs Land Limited against All Plaintiffs by Long Holdings Group, Inc..(Halloran, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Long Holdings Group, Inc. by Federal Insurance Company.(Williamson, David) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (TJZ). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #32 granting Proposed Agreed Order / Stipulation for Leave to Plead by Continental Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/1/2021. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Tanya M. Murray: re 33 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Tanya M. Murray (ECO) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #30 Motion for Tanya M. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois; granting #31 Motion for Kenneth C. Newa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/1/2021. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Edward B. Atkins for review: re #30 MOTION for Tanya M. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5088978), #31 MOTION for Kenneth C. Newa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5088980) (ECO) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Kenneth C. Newa re #31 MOTION for Kenneth C. Newa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5088980). (ECO) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Tanya M. Murray re #30 MOTION for Tanya M. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5088978). (ECO) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Proposed Agreed Order / Stipulation for Leave to Plead by Continental Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Wardle, Samuel) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketParty Chubb Group of Insurance Companies and Great Northern Insurance Company terminated per Chambers re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal DE #29 (ECO) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF FILING by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Summons Liberty Mutual, #2 Summons Longs Land Limited)(Stephenson, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company; Summons issued and attested copy of complaint returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (TJZ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois OF SUMMONS TO BE ATTESTED (Attachments: #1 Summons to Continental Casualty Company)(Stephenson, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Continental Casualty Company, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Long Holdings Group, Inc., Longs Land Limited; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois re #1 Complaint,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Summons Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, #2 Summons Continental Casualty Company, #3 Summons Federal Insurance Company, #4 Summons Great Northern Insurance Company, #5 Summons Long Holdings Group, Inc./Cincinnati Drum Service Inc., #6 Summons Longs Land Limited)(Stephenson, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Brian Stephenson re #1 Complaint; attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number [21-99999]. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America identifying Other Affiliate St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Phoenix Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company of America.. (ECO) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5041226), filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Letter dated 5/17/2021, #3 Exhibit B-Travelers Property Casualty Policy, #4 Exhibit C-Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit D- Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Policy, #6 Exhibit E-Travelers Commercial Insurance Policy, #7 Exhibit F-St Paul Travelers Commercial Insurance Policy, #8 Exhibit G-St. Paul Travelers Commercial Insurance Policy, #9 Exhibit H-Travelers Commercial Insurance Policy, #10 Exhibit I-Travelers Commercial Insurance Policy, #11 Exhibit J-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #12 Exhibit K-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #13 Exhibit L-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #14 Exhibit M-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #15 Exhibit N-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #16 Exhibit O-St. Paul Renewal Certificate, #17 Exhibit P-St. Paul Policy Introduction, #18 Exhibit Q-Travelers Umbrella Policy, #19 Exhibit R-St Paul Travelers Umbrella Policy, #20 Exhibit S-St Paul Travelers Umbrella Policy, #21 Exhibit T-Travelers Umbrella Policy, #22 Exhibit U-Travelers Umbrella Policy, #23 Exhibit V-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #24 Exhibit W-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #25 Exhibit X-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #26 Exhibit Y-Travelers Report Claims Policy, #27 Exhibit Z-Travelers Report Claims Policy)(ECO) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant