Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2021 at 11:13:57 (UTC).

The State Of Texas, et al V Google, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 The State Of Texas filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Google, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Arkansas

State of North Dakota

State of Missouri

The State Of Texas

State of Idaho

State of Mississippi

State of South Dakota

Commonwealth of Kentucky

State of Utah

State of Indiana

Defendant

Google, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Matthew Ashton

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

P O Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Johnathan R Carter

Attorney at Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Stephen M Hoeplinger

Attorney at Missouri Attorney General's Office

Po Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102

Alex J Brown

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm, PC - Houston

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy. N., Ste. 100

Houston, TX 77064

Shawn Cowles

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas - 214

214 W 14Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Zeke DeRose, III

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm, PC - Houston

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy. N., Ste. 100

Houston, TX 77064

Brooke Clason Smith

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4270

Chicago, IL 60606

W Mark Lanier

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm

6810 Fm 1960 West, Po Box 691448

Houston, TX 77269-1448

Ashley C Keller

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4270

Chicago, IL 60606

Warren D Postman

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

1300 I Street, N.W., Suite 400E

Washington, DC 20005

John K Olson

Attorney at Office of the Idaho Attorney General

945 W. Jefferson St., Second Floor, P.O Box 83720

Boise, ID 83720

Brett DeLange

Attorney at Office of the Idaho Attorney General

945 W. Jefferson St., Second Floor, P.O Box 83720

Boise, ID 83720

Hart Martin

Attorney at Mississippi Attorney General's Office

P.O. Box 220

Jackson, MS 39205

Yvette K Lafrentz

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1

Pierre, SD 57501

Matthew Michaloski

Attorney at Office of the Indiana Attorney General

302 W Washington St, Igcs 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46234

Scott Barnhart

Attorney at Office of the Indiana Attorney General

302 W Washington St, Igcs 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46234

Defendant Attorneys

Bryce L Callahan

Attorney at Yetter Coleman, LLP - Houston

909 Fannin, Suite 3600

Houston, TX 77010

Julie Elmer

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

700 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Eric Mahr

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

700 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

John D. Harkrider

Attorney at Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP - NY

114 West 47Th Street

New York, NY 10036

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) ORDER granting #62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Google LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/10/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John K Olson on behalf of State of Idaho. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8242759. (Olson, John) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

62 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#62

(#62) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Google LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yetter, R) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

61 #6

Exhibit B2

61 #5

Exhibit B1

61 #4

Exhibit B

61 #3

Exhibit A2

61 #2

Exhibit A1

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yvette K Lafrentz on behalf of State of South Dakota. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8165089. (Lafrentz, Yvette) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brett DeLange on behalf of State of Idaho. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8164572. (DeLange, Brett) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hart Martin on behalf of State of Mississippi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8163309. (Martin, Hart) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elin S Alm on behalf of State of North Dakota. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8162739. (Alm, Elin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/17/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#3) ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/17/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (REDACTED) against Google, LLC, filed by State of Mississippi, State of Idaho, State of Missouri, State of South Dakota, State of Arkansas, State of North Dakota, The State Of Texas, State of Indiana, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kls, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER granting #62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Google LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/10/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John K Olson on behalf of State of Idaho. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8242759. (Olson, John) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Sealed Second Declaration of A. Rope, Declaration of B. Callahan and Exhibits B1 and B2 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #61 Response in Support of Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2)(Yetter, R) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Google LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yetter, R) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE in Support re #28 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Google, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Memorandum in Support Reply in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a) filed by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit B3, #8 Exhibit B4, #9 Exhibit B5, #10 Exhibit B6, #11 Exhibit B7, #12 Exhibit B8, #13 Exhibit B9, #14 Exhibit B10, #15 Exhibit B11, #16 Exhibit B12, #17 Exhibit C)(Yetter, R) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE: The public may access an audio-only feed of the hearing on Defendant Google, LLC.'s Motion to Transfer Venue #28 set for Friday, 3/5/2021, at 10:00 a.m. by dialing (877) 336-1839 (Access Code: 6161094). Proceedings may not be recorded or otherwise broadcast for public dissemination.(ldm) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #28 MOTION to Change Venue: Defendant Google, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Memorandum in Support is set for hearing on Friday, 3/5/2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (ldm) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by The State Of Texas for proceedings held on 2/4/2021 Preliminary Scheduling Conference before Judge Sean D. Jordan. (DeRose, Zeke)(Forwarded to Gayle Wear on 2/9/2021) (ljw, ). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on February 4, 2021, before Judge Sean D. Jordan. Court Reporter: Gayle Wear, RPR, CRR; Telephone number: 214-872-4867. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 3/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2021. (gwear, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brooke Clason Smith on behalf of The State Of Texas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8239386. (Smith, Brooke) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yvette K Lafrentz on behalf of State of South Dakota. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8165089. (Lafrentz, Yvette) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brett DeLange on behalf of State of Idaho. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8164572. (DeLange, Brett) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hart Martin on behalf of State of Mississippi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8163309. (Martin, Hart) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elin S Alm on behalf of State of North Dakota. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8162739. (Alm, Elin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/17/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number TXE100020929 (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Seal Document (Unredacted Complaint) by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Dakota, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, The State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashton, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (REDACTED) against Google, LLC, filed by State of Mississippi, State of Idaho, State of Missouri, State of South Dakota, State of Arkansas, State of North Dakota, The State Of Texas, State of Indiana, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kls, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Harkrider

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryce L. Callahan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Mahr