This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2019 at 12:47:14 (UTC).

The Scotts Company LLC et al v. SBM Life Science Corp.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 The Scotts Company LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against SBM Life Science Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01275

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Scotts Company LLC

OMS Investments, Inc.

Defendant

SBM Life Science Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Dirisamer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

41 South High St., Suite 3300

Columbus, OH 43215

Joshua Stewart Frick

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

John T. Gabrielides

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher M. Dolan

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

David R. Boaz

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

555 Fayetteville St, Suite 1100

Raleigh, NC 27601

Ana J. Friedman

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

John F. Morrow, Jr.

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Steven A. Chang

Attorney at Reminger, Co., LPA

8Th Floor, 200 Civic Center Dr.

Columbus, OH 43215

Acacia Marie Perko

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

Roy A Hulme

Attorney at Reminger & Reminger

1400 Midland Building, 101 Prospect Avenue West

Cleveland, OH 44115-1093

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation in 5/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 6/26/2019; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2019; Discovery due by 4/30/2020; Proposed Order re: ESI production due by 7/19/2019; Clawback Agreement due by 8/7/2019; Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020; Primary Expert due by 2/28/2020; Rebuttal Expert due by 3/31/2020; Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2020; Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/10/2020; Defendants have until 3 months from the date of this Order to decide whether it will rely on opinions of counsel to rebut claim of willful infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/26/2019. (kk2) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

18 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6982445) of John Gabrielides by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977261) of Joshua Frick by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

16 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977180) of Christopher Dolan by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Acacia Marie Perko for Defendant SBM Life Science Corp. (Perko, Acacia) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to SBM Life Science Corp.. (daf) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for OMS Investments, Inc... (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs The Scotts Company LLC, The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for The Scotts Company LLC.. (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against SBM Life Science Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6871325), filed by The Scotts Company LLC, OMS Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Gabrielides is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/27/2019. (daf) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation in 5/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 6/26/2019; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2019; Discovery due by 4/30/2020; Proposed Order re: ESI production due by 7/19/2019; Clawback Agreement due by 8/7/2019; Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020; Primary Expert due by 2/28/2020; Rebuttal Expert due by 3/31/2020; Settlement Demand due by 4/3/2020; Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/10/2020; Defendants have until 3 months from the date of this Order to decide whether it will rely on opinions of counsel to rebut claim of willful infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/26/2019. (kk2) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/26/2019. (jr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6982445) of John Gabrielides by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Dolan and Joshua Frick are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2019. (daf) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977261) of Joshua Frick by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6977180) of Christopher Dolan by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Chang for Defendant SBM Life Science Corp. (Chang, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Company LLC. (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Notice of Correction: ECF No. 13 was filed inadvertently in the wrong case. The Document has been removed from the docket and filed in the correct case 2:19-cv-76. (daf) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 @ 2:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Acacia Marie Perko for Defendant SBM Life Science Corp. (Perko, Acacia) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: SBM Life Science Corp. answer due 6/5/2019. (daf) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Defendant SBM Life Science Corp.. (Hulme, Roy) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to SBM Life Science Corp.. (daf) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs OMS Investments, Inc., The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for OMS Investments, Inc... (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs The Scotts Company LLC, The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company identifying Corporate Parent The Scotts Miracle-Gro Company for The Scotts Company LLC.. (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against SBM Life Science Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6871325), filed by The Scotts Company LLC, OMS Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dirisamer, David) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less