This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2019 at 07:14:02 (UTC).

The Regents of the University of California v. Ikea of Sweden AB et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 The Regents of the University of California filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ikea of Sweden AB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06573

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Regents of the University of California

Defendants

Ikea of Sweden AB

Ikea Distribution Services Inc.

Ikea North America Services, LLC

Ikea Supply AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn G Hansen

Vincent K Yip

Staci Jennifer Riordan

Seth David Levy

Peter James Wied

Matthew A Richards

Tracy Steindel Ickes

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Bonella

Kenneth E Keller

Joseph R Klinicki

Christopher Edward Stretch

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

42 #2

Redacted Document Notice of Interested Parties

42 #1

Proposed Order

#42

41 #3

Proposed Order

41 #2

Exhibit A to M Bonnella Decl

41 #1

Declaration Michael Bonella

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #42 APPLICATION to Seal Document (bm) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea of Sweden AB, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #43 served on Declaration and [UNREDACTED] Notice of Interested Parties. (Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Notice of Interested Parties under seal #42 filed by Defendants Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea of Sweden AB. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Interested Parties)(Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) APPLICATION to file document Notice of Interested Parties under seal filed by Defendants Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea of Sweden AB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Notice of Interested Parties)(Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of the Matter before ITC filed by Defendants Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea of Sweden AB. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Bonella, #2 Exhibit A to M Bonnella Decl, #3 Proposed Order) (Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea of Sweden AB.(Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order Setting Scheduling Conference - form only #36 . The order was issued in the wrong case. The clerk will strike the document and vacate the scheduling conference. (smo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STRICKEN -- ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (smo) Modified on 9/5/2019 (smo). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #32 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph R Klinick APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ikea of Sweden AB, Ikea Supply Ag. Ikea Dist. Services, Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, designating Kenneth E Keller as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Bonella APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ikea of Sweden AB, Ikea Supply Ag. Ikea Dist. Services, Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC, designating Kenneth E Keller as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) Related Case(s): ITC Docket No. 3401 (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-6570, 2:19-cv-6571, 2:19-cv-6572 (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California, identifying Longford Capital Fund II, LP, Hirokuni Asamizu, Natalie Fellows DeMille, Steven P. DenBaars, Shuji Nakamura, James S. Speck, Ikea of Sweden AB, Ikea Supply AG, Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea North America Services, LLC. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24168641 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Attorney Shawn G Hansen added to party The Regents of the University of California(pty:pla))(Hansen, Shawn) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less