This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 09:53:12 (UTC).

The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. et al v. Google LLC et al

Case Summary

On November 19, 2021, The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. (“AudienceScience”) and Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., as General Receiver for the Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. (“Revitalization Partners”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Deron R. Dacus of The Dacus Firm, P.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Google LLC (“Google”) and YouTube, LLC (“YouTube”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages and costs among other reliefs for the alleged infringement of United States patents owned by the Plaintiffs. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiffs filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent Nos. 7,747,676 (the “’676 patent”), 7,882,175 (the “’175 patent”), and 8,082,298 (the “’298 patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”) owned by the Plaintiffs.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that “Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe the ’676 patent literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and/or importing into the United States, without authority, the Accused Products which perform each and every limitation of at least claim 1 of the ’676 patent. Defendants perform a method using a computing system having a processor and a memory for selecting an advertising message for inclusion in a requested web page. Defendants were made aware of the ’676 patent and their infringement thereof at least as early as November 18, 2021, when Revitalization Partners provided notice of Defendants’ infringement of the ’676 patent to Sundar Pichai of Google and Susan Wojcicki of YouTube.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that “Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe the ’175 patent literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and/or importing into the United States, without authority, the Accused Products which contain each and every limitation of at least claim 12 of the ’175 patent. Defendants operate a computer-readable storage device whose contents cause a computing system to perform a method for designating an advertising message for inclusion in a requested web page. The Accused Products select advertisements to include in web pages and videos that billions of users request.”

 

The Plaintiffs also alleged that “Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe the ’298 patent literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and/or importing into the United States, without authority, the Accused Products which contain each and every limitation of at least claim 12 of the ’298 patent. Defendants operate a computer-readable device whose contents cause a computing system to perform a method for designating an advertising message for inclusion in a requested web page.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs for alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents owned by the Plaintiffs.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the Court that the Asserted Patents be judged valid, enforceable, and infringed by Defendants, that the Plaintiffs be awarded a judgment against Defendants for damages together with interests and costs and that the Court declares this an exceptional case and award Plaintiffs their attorneys’ fees along with such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01209

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.

Revitalization Partners, L.L.C.

Defendants

Google LLC

YouTube, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

David Alberti

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Marc Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Margaret Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Robert F. Kramer

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Sal Lim

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Zachariah A. Higgins

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Bellol

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Streetsuite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zachariah A. Higgins. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Zachariah A. Higgins) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15518959) by on behalf of Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sal Lim. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert F. Kramer. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Alberti. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#18) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sal Lim. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to YouTube, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15458509), filed by The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc., Revitalization Partners, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dacus, Deron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

28 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zachariah A. Higgins. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Zachariah A. Higgins) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15518959) by on behalf of Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Alberti. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sal Lim. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert F. Kramer. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Day. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Belloli. Attorney added for Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 1/27/2022; YouTube, LLC answer due 1/27/2022. (ir) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE Regarding Agreed Request to Change Deadline for Defendants Google LLC and YouTube, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc., Revitalization Partners, L.L.C.. YouTube, LLC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Margaret Elizabeth Day) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15465705) by on behalf of Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus (on behalf of Marc Belloli) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15465672) by on behalf of Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to YouTube, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Revitalization Partners, L.L.C., The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Dacus, Deron) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15458509), filed by The Receivership Estate of AudienceScience Inc., Revitalization Partners, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dacus, Deron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Arnette Amstutz