Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 07:52:57 (UTC).

The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida v. Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-21206

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida

The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida doing business as Jackson Health System

Defendants

Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services

U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas F. Panza

Attorney at Panza Maurer & Maynard P.A.

2400 East Commercial Blvd, Ste 905, Fort Lauderdale

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Eugene Shy, Jr.

Attorney at Miami-Dade County Attorney

1611 Nw 12Th Avenue, Suite 109, West Wing

Miami, FL 33136

Christopher Ellis Gottfried

Attorney at Panza, Maurer & Maynard P.A.

2400 East Commercial Boulevard, Suite 905

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Christopher Charles Kokoruda

Attorney at Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office

1611 Nw 12Th Avenue, West Wing, Suite 109

Miami, FL 33136

Charles A. Luband

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kiran Patel

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th Street, Suite 335

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, filed by Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

48 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1

#48

(#48) RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, filed by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#47

(#47) NOTICE by Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services of Defendants' Position on a Stay of this Case (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

42 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#39

(#48) RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, filed by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#38

(#42) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference re #38 Order on Motion to Continue, by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#37

(#44) PAPERLESS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: re #38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/3/2019 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Hearing to be rescheduled for Thursday, June 6, 2019. (ps1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

1 #11

Summon(s) Ariana Fajardo Orshan

1 #10

Summon(s) William Barr

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, filed by Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, filed by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE by Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services of Defendants' Position on a Stay of this Case (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • (#46) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Scheduling Conference held on 6/6/2019. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski, Eugene Shy, Jr, Christopher Ellis Gottfried, Charles A. Luband, Thomas F. Panza, Christopher Charles Kokoruda. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ado) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#45) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 6/6/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) PAPERLESS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: re #38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/3/2019 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Hearing to be rescheduled for Thursday, June 6, 2019. (ps1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER denying #42 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference re #38 Order on Motion to Continue, by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER denying #30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida of Filing (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#9) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff may re-file a motion for a preliminary injunction after Defendants are properly served. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles Luband. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11518539 by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Luband, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gottfried, Christopher) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kiran Patel. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11518482 by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Patel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gottfried, Christopher) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11517625, filed by The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summon(s) Alex Azar, #9 Summon(s) Seema Verma, #10 Summon(s) William Barr, #11 Summon(s) Ariana Fajardo Orshan, #12 Summon(s) Centers for Medicare and Medicaid, #13 Summon(s) Department of Health and Human Services)(Panza, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County The is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant