This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:55:39 (UTC).

The Plexus Groupe, LLC v. D&S Residental Services, LP. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 The Plexus Groupe, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against D S Residental Services, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00984

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Plexus Groupe, LLC

Defendants

NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC.

D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP

Sevita Whole Health, LLC

National Mentor Holdings, Inc. doing business as Sevita formerly known as The Mentor Network

The Mentor Network

D&S Residental Services, LP doing business as D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Telly Andrews

Attorney at KMA Zuckert LLC

200 W. Madison Street, 16Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Michael David Krause

Attorney at Bollinger Connolly Krause LLC

500 West Madison Street, Suite 2430

Chicago, IL 60661

Corinne M Cundiff

Attorney at Connolly Krause, LLC

500 W. Madison Street, Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Affidavit Gina Martin

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM by National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #14 pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and failure to state a claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gina Martin)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION by Defendants National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(2) and failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

13 #1

Affidavit Gina Martin

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM by D&S Residental Services, LP in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gina Martin)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant D&S Residental Services, LP to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #10 . The deadline for Defendants to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 04/22/2022. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

10 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants D&S Residental Services, LP, National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#8

(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/10/2022, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by that date, the removing party's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of notice of removal by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 402.00, receipt no. 0752-19189040, (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021CH06373) filed by D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP, NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC., Sevita Whole Health, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19190825. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM by National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #14 pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and failure to state a claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gina Martin)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION by Defendants National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(2) and failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM by D&S Residental Services, LP in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #12 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gina Martin)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendant D&S Residental Services, LP to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #10 . The deadline for Defendants to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 04/22/2022. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants D&S Residental Services, LP, National Mentor Holdings, Inc., Sevita Whole Health, LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docket(#9) REFUND PROCESSED re REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 402.00, receipt no. 0752-19189040. (lw, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff (bg, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/10/2022, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by that date, the removing party's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of notice of removal by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 402.00, receipt no. 0752-19189040, (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021CH06373) filed by D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP, NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC., Sevita Whole Health, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19190825. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP, NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC., Sevita Whole Health, LLC by Corinne M Cundiff (Cundiff, Corinne) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP, NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC., Sevita Whole Health, LLC by Michael David Krause (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by D&S Residental Services, LP d/b/a D&S Community Services and D&S Residential Services, LP, NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC., Sevita Whole Health, LLC (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Mentor Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Mentor Network doing business as Florida Mentor is a litigant

Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant