This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2020 at 14:10:11 (UTC).

The People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 The People of the State of Illinois filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02169

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The People of the State of Illinois

The People of Union County

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Wal-mart Stores East, LP, Individually and d/b/a Wal-mart Pharmacy Warehouses

H.D. Smith, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ann Callis

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.c.

2227 South State Route157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Thomas Lech

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.c.

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Alexander Cooper

Attorney at Tabet DiVito & Rothstein LLC

The Rookery Building, 209 S. Lasalle St., 7Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

Daniel L. Stanner

Attorney at Tabet DiVito Rothstein

209 South Lasalle Street, 7Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

Erik William Snapp

Attorney at Dechert LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60601

Margaret Catherine O'Connor

Attorney at Dechert Llp

35 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Nicholas Martin Berg

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive, 32Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Tinos Diamantatos

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Kenneth M. Gorenberg

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Emily Newhouse Dillingham

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60602

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale Llp

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St Louis, MO 63105

Sarah E. Harmon

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale Llp

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Other Attorneys

Steven Todd Whitmer

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrea Verney

Attorney at Locke Lord Llp

111 S. Wcker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel I. Schlessinger

Attorney at Jaszczuk P.C.

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 1775

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin L. Roth

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Conor B. O'Croinin

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Suite 2440, 100 East Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Donna M. Welch

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Sherry Ann Knutson

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 6950

Chicago, IL 60606

Timothy William Knapp

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

300 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) TRANSFERRED to the Northern District Ohio the electronic record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#44

(#44) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 04/17/2019. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#43

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #34 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#42

(#42) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Specgx LLC (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#41

(#41) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mallinckrodt LLC (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#40

(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#39

(#39) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#38

(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#34

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #34 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Verney, Andrea) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-003909) filed by CVS Health Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15648026. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Emison, Sky) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketElectronic Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45286, filed 04/18/2019. (ek, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) TRANSFERRED to the Northern District Ohio the electronic record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 04/17/2019. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #34 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Specgx LLC (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mallinckrodt LLC (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs County of Union, The People of Union County, The People of the State of Illinois by Thomas Lech (Lech, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15656028. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Croinin, Conor) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(rp, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation of Filing Notice of Filing Removal in State Court (Whitmer, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Steven Todd Whitmer (Whitmer, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Andrea Verney (Verney, Andrea) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Verney, Andrea) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-003909) filed by CVS Health Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15648026. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Emison, Sky) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peoples Union LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where H.D. Smith, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant