This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2019 at 07:11:50 (UTC).

People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 People of the State of Illinois filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Reona J. Daly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00682

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

Referral Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The People of the State of Illinois

Williamson County, Illinois

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

American Pain Society

Abbott Laboratories

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

American Academy of Pain Medicine

American Geriatric Society

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Perry Fine

Cephalon, Inc.

Scott Fishman

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark D. Prince

Attorney at Prince Law Firm

404 North Monroe Street

Marion, IL 62959

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel L. Stanner

Attorney at Tabet DiVito & Rothstein LLC

209 S. Lasalle Street, 7Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604-1219

Erik W. Snapp

Attorney at Dechert LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Troy A. Bozarth

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STRICKEN - Mail, Document #17(NEF), Returned as Undeliverable. Mail originally sent to Darryl L. Wilson at Marion. (cjo) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cjo). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 102) TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO in regard to MDL No. 2804. (cjo) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel L. Stanner $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3920805 by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Stanner, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

5 #1

Consent Brochure

#5

(#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-682-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Snapp on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Snapp, Erik) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-73 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3914624), filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #11 Mail Returned. Document filed in the incorrect case. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STRICKEN - Mail, Document #17(NEF), Returned as Undeliverable. Mail originally sent to Darryl L. Wilson at Marion. (cjo) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cjo). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#10) Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45657, filed 07/23/2019. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio this date. (cjo) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 102) TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO in regard to MDL No. 2804. (cjo) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel L. Stanner on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel L. Stanner $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3920805 by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Stanner, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-682-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Snapp on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Snapp, Erik) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-73 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3914624), filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Purdue Pharma L.P. is a litigant