This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:08:29 (UTC).

The New Georgia Project et al v. Raffensperger et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 The New Georgia Project filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Raffensperger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reagan Jennings

The New Georgia Project

Defendants

Tim McFalls

John Mangano

Brad Raffensperger

Dele Lowman Smith

Samuel E. Tillman

Diane Scrimpshire

Aldren Sadler, Sr.

Neera Bahl

Charles Knapper

Susan Motter

Colin Mcrae

Bob Finnegan

Darlene Johnson

Henry Ficklin

Jesse Evans

Alice O'Lenick

Jon Pannell

Randy Ingram

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joyce Gist Lewis

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

1201 W. Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 3250

Atlanta, GA 30309

Marc E. Elias

Attorney at Perkins Coie-DC

Suite 600, 700 Thirteenth St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-2011

Amanda R. Callais

Attorney at Perkins Coie-DC

Suite 600, 700 Thirteenth St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-2011

Halsey G. Knapp, Jr

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

One Atlantic Center, Ste 3250, 1201 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Adam Martin Sparks

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

One Atlantic Center, Ste 3250, 1201 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Stephanie R. Holstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie-WA

1201 Third Avenue, 48Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lilian Magarita Timmermann

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - CO

1900 16Th Street

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan Francis Jacoutot

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan P. Tyson

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Diane Festin LaRoss

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Loree Anne Paradise

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Charlene S McGowan

Attorney at Office of the Georgia Attorney General

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Brian Edward Lake

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC -Atl

500 Fourteenth St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

Alexander Fraser Denton

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield LLC

500 14Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

Carey Allen Miller

Attorney at Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC -Atl

500 Fourteenth St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

Alan G. Snipes

Attorney at Page, Scrantom, Sprouse, Tucker & Ford, P.C.

111 Bay Avenue Suite 300, P.O. Box 1199, Ste 3Rd Floor

Columbus, GA 31902

Gregory C. Sowell

Attorney at Cook & Tolley, LLP

304 E. Washington St.

Athens, GA 30601-2751

William H. Noland

Attorney at Noland Law Firm, LLC

5400 Riverside Drive, Ste 205

Macon, GA 31210

Other Attorneys

Megan Nicole Martin

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

Timothy M. Boughey

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

89 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#89

#88

#87

#86

84 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Grantig Motion for Leave to File Excess

#84

81 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed order

#81

2 #7

Summons D Johnson

2 #6

Summons Clemmons

2 #5

Summons Brooks

2 #4

Summons Barham

2 #3

Summons Baldwin

2 #2

Summons Bahl

2 #1

Summons Andrews

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

291 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Briefs Opposing Motions to Dismiss (Unopposed in Part and Consent in Part) by Reagan Jennings, Beverly Pyne, The New Georgia Project, Candace Woodall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Colin McRae, Wanda Andrews, William L. Norse, Jon Pannell, and Randolph Slay, in their official capacities as Members of the Chatham County Board of Registrars, shall file any responsive pleading responding to the Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/30/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file an additional ten (10) pages - for a total of thirty-five (35) pages - to their forthcoming Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/30/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER granting #79 Motion to Substitute Party. TALULA MARTIN, in her official capacity as Member of the Douglas County Board of Elections and Registration, is DISMISSED from this action. MAURICE HURRY, in his official capacity as Member of the Douglas County Board of Elections and Registration, is substituted into this action as party defendant in place of Ms. Martin. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reflect the proper identification of the Douglas County Board of Elections and Registration Defendants in the style of this action as DAVID C. FEDACK, MAURICE HURRY, ROBERT PROCTOR, DANIEL ZIMMERMANN, and MYESHA GOOD, in their official capacities as Members of the Douglas County Board of Elections and Registration. The deadline for Mr. Hurry to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be on or before June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/30/2020. (Defendant Maurice Hurry added. Defendant Talula Martin terminated). (jpk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Grantig Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages)(Belinfante, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Belinfante, Joshua) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) County Defendants' Consolidated MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Darry Hicks, Addison Lester, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, Aaron Wright. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 6/29/2020 to edit text (jpk). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time file responsive pleading re: #33 Amended Complaint, by Colin Mcrae. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Hart, Ralph) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: (Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross.) The Court DIRECTS the Parties to jointly submit, within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order, a joint proposed schedule of the hearing setting forth how much time is requested by each party for oral argument. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/25/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca N. Sullivan, Vivian Thomas, Dustin Thompson, Ann Till, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu, Carol Wesley, Eleanor White, Frederick Williams, Darryl O. Wilson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Thomas, #2 Summons Thompson, #3 Summons Till, #4 Summons Tillman, #5 Summons Vu, #6 Summons Wesley, #7 Summons White, #8 Summons Williams, #9 Summons Wilson Jr)(tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Uhland Roberts, Kelly Robinson, Aldren Sadler, Sr., Ben Satterfield, Diane Scrimpshire, Dontravious M. Simmons, Randolph Slay, Dele Lowman Smith, Herbert Spangler, Annabelle T. Stubbs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robinson, #2 Summons Sadler, #3 Summons Satterfield, #4 Summons Scrimpshire, #5 Summons Simmons, #6 Summons Slay, #7 Summons Smith, #8 Summons Spangler, #9 Summons Stubbs)(tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Joel Natt, William L. Norse, Alice O'Lenick, Jon Pannell, Linda Parker, Cassandra Powell, Robert Proctor, Patricia Pullar, Carla Radzikinas, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Summons Norse, #2 Summons O'Lenick, #3 Summons Pannell, #4 Summons Parker, #5 Summons Powell, #6 Summons Proctor, #7 Summons Pullar, #8 Summons Radzikinas, #9 Summons Raffensperger)(tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Addison Lester, Anthony Lewis, Barbara Luth, John Mangano, Talula Martin, Matthew Mashburn, Tim McFalls, Colin Mcrae, Pamela Middleton, Susan Motter. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lewis, #2 Summons Luth, #3 Summons Mangano, #4 Summons Martin, #5 Summons Mashburn, #6 Summons McFalls, #7 Summons MaRae, #8 Summons Middleton, #9 Summons Motter)(tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Benny G. Hand, Darry Hicks, Randy Ingram, Karen James, Margaret Jenkins, Aaron Johnson, Mike Kaplan, Charles Knapper, Anh Le, Johnny Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hicks, #2 Summons Ingram, #3 Summons J Wilson, #4 Summons James, #5 Summons Jenkins, #6 Summons Johnson, #7 Summons Kaplan, #8 Summons Knapper, #9 Summons Le)(tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sherry T. Barnes, Matthew Blender, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Jesse Evans, Willa Fambrough, Henry Ficklin, Bob Finnegan, Myesha Good, Dorothy Foster Hall. (Attachments: #1 Summons Blender, #2 Summons Brown, #3 Summons Dicks, #4 Summons Evans, #5 Summons Fambrough, #6 Summons Ficklin, #7 Summons Finnegan, #8 Summons Good, #9 Summons Hall)(tmf) Modified on 5/11/2020 to edit filing date(tmf). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Reagan Jennings, The New Georgia Project, Candace Woodall. (tmf) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Fred Aiken, Wanda Andrews, Neera Bahl, Beauty Baldwin, Gary Barham, Jessica M. Brooks, Dee Clemmons, Phil Daniell, Diane Givens, Darlene Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Andrews, #2 Summons Bahl, #3 Summons Baldwin, #4 Summons Barham, #5 Summons Brooks, #6 Summons Clemmons, #7 Summons D Johnson, #8 Summons Daniell, #9 Summons Givens)(tmf) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Complaint,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Reagan Jennings, The New Georgia Project, Candace Woodall. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9679300) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 5/8/2020 to edit text(tmf). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The New Georgia Project is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy M. Boughey