This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:13:59 (UTC).

The Music Force, LLC v. Sony Music Holdings Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 The Music Force, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Sony Music Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06430

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

The Music Force, LLC

Defendants

Montero Lamar Hill

Jeffry Maxwell Newlin

Lil Nas X

Sony Music Holdings Inc

Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC

Wynterbeats

Sony Corporation of America

Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Michael Richard Shapiro

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Shapiro APC

11500 Olympic Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Zia F Modabber

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3012

Leah E.A. Solomon

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3012

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #27 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be due on or before October 18, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#28

(#28) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC, Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #27 served on 09/16/2019. (Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

27 #2

Proposed Order

27 #1

Declaration of Zia Modabber

#27

(#27) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 1, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC, Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zia Modabber, #2 Proposed Order)(Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Holdings Inc answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Corporation of America answer now due 9/18/2019; Jeffry Maxwell Newlin answer now due 9/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC; Sony Music Holdings Inc; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC; Sony Corporation of America.(Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Corporation of America(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Holdings Inc(pty:dft))(Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#25

(#25) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Jeffry Maxwell Newlin served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffry Maxwell Newlin, aka Wynterbeats in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#24

(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Corporation of America served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#23

(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#26) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Holdings Inc answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Corporation of America answer now due 9/18/2019; Jeffry Maxwell Newlin answer now due 9/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC; Sony Music Holdings Inc; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC; Sony Corporation of America.(Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Corporation of America(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Holdings Inc(pty:dft))(Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #27 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be due on or before October 18, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC, Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #27 served on 09/16/2019. (Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 1, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC, Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zia Modabber, #2 Proposed Order)(Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Holdings Inc answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC answer now due 9/18/2019; Sony Corporation of America answer now due 9/18/2019; Jeffry Maxwell Newlin answer now due 9/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC; Sony Music Holdings Inc; Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC; Sony Corporation of America.(Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Corporation of America(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Zia F Modabber added to party Sony Music Holdings Inc(pty:dft))(Modabber, Zia) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Jeffry Maxwell Newlin served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffry Maxwell Newlin, aka Wynterbeats in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Corporation of America served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Music Entertainment Downloads LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Music Entertainment Digital LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, upon Defendant Sony Music Holdings Inc served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for service by serving Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#20) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC, (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant The Music Force, LLC. (Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24143516 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff The Music Force, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael Richard Shapiro added to party The Music Force, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Shapiro, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY MUSIC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant