This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2020 at 07:37:42 (UTC).

Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust v. Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and Troy L. Nunley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02479

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust

Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp.

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Steven John Cottrell

Attorney at Steven J. Cotrell, a Professional Law Corporation

125 North Pleasant Ave.

Lodi, CA 95240

Charles L Hastings

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles L. Hastings

4568 Feather River Drive, Suite A

Stockton, CA 95219

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David A. Yudelson

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP

2029 Century Park E, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

J. Daniel Weidner, PHV

Attorney at Koley Jessen P.C., L.L.O.

1125 South 103Rd St., Suite 800

Omaha, NE 68124

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

5 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Join Required Parties

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

VDRP

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/29/2020 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint substituting Craig Dunn and John Rau in their capacities as Trustees of the Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust as plaintiffs in this matter within 21 days from the date of the Court's Order, and Defendant shall have 21 days from the date Plaintiff(s) file an AmendedComplaint to file an amended Answer and Counterclaim. (Huang, H) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Resolving Defendant's Motion to Join Required Parties re #5 Motion to Join Required Parties by Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weidner, J.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/23/2020: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Join Required Parties (ECF No. #7 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 2/6/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. All briefing shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c) and (d) and the 2/6/2020 date. Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. #11 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER Granting #11 Request for Telephonic Appearance by Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust. (Hastings, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 2/6/2020 Motion to Join hearing by Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust. (Hastings, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/22/2020 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Charles L Hastings for Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust in place of attorney Steven John Cottrell. (Coll, A) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Melvin Duane Roush Revocable Trust. (Hastings, Charles) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/2020. ADDING Attorney J. Daniel Weidner, PHV for Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to JOIN REQUIRED PARTIES Chris Dunn and John Rau by Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Modified on 12/27/2019 (Krueger, M). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/2019: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Join Required Parties (ECF No. #5 ). The Motion as filed is deficient and the Defendant is directed to notice the Motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(a). Accordingly, the motion is TERMINATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION To Join Required Parties by Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Yudelson, David) Modified on 1/21/2020 (Becknal, R). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp. for attorney D. Daniel Weidner to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Yudelson, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT for Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8629037. (Yudelson, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp.s .(Yudelson, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Sacramento, case number 34-2019-00267485 by Wilson OVS Acquisition Corp. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8615441) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Of David A. Yudelson, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Proof of Service)(Yudelson, David) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less